EP0913720 - Irradiation device for an alignment layer of a liquid crystal cell element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2008 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states USHIODENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/25] |
Former [1999/18] | For all designated states USHIODENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Shinji 378-2, Noboritoshinmachi, Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Mizuno, Osamu 4299-6, Wakamatsu-cho Mishima-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2007/17] |
Former [1999/18] | 01 /
Suzuki, Shinji 378-2, Noboritoshinmachi, Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kawasaki-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Mizuno, Osamu 4299-6, Wakamatsu-cho Mishima-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Tomerius, Isabel, et al Lang & Tomerius Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Rosa-Bavarese-Strasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | Tomerius, Isabel, Dr., et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Postfach 151324 80048 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/30] | Tomerius, Isabel, et al Patentanwälte Weber & Heim Bavariaring 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/18] | Tomerius, Isabel, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte Weber & Heim, Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98120401.9 | 28.10.1998 | [1999/18] | Priority number, date | JP19970296620 | 29.10.1997 Original published format: JP 29662097 | JP19970296621 | 29.10.1997 Original published format: JP 29662197 | JP19980098874 | 10.04.1998 Original published format: JP 9887498 | JP19980098875 | 10.04.1998 Original published format: JP 9887598 | [1999/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0913720 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0913720 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | [1999/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0913720 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1335, G02B5/30, G02B27/28, G02F1/1337 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
G02B5/3025 (EP,US);
G02F1/1303 (KR);
G02B5/3066 (EP,US);
G02F1/133788 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/18] | G02F1/1335, G02B5/30, G02B27/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/33] |
Former [1999/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bestrahlungsvorrichtung für eine Orientierungsschicht für Flüssigkristallanzeigen | [1999/18] | English: | Irradiation device for an alignment layer of a liquid crystal cell element | [1999/18] | French: | Dispositif d'irradiation d'une couche d'alignement pour dispositifs d'affichage à cristal liquide | [1999/18] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 09.06.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.06.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 14.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE | 06.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.10.2006 | 19.10.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 25.10.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06022140.5 / EP1750163 | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.07.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 20.06.2007 | [2008/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0754976 (USHIO ELECTRIC INC [JP]) [A] 1,5,9 * abstract *; | [A]WO9737273 (ALLIANT TECHSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,5,9 * page 27, line 18 - line 28 * * page 28, line 1 - line 8 * * figure 4; example 13 *; | [A]GB2309794 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1,5,9 * abstract * | [XA] - HASEGAWA M ET AL, "NEMATIC HOMOGENEOUS ALIGNMENT BY PHOTO DEPOLYMERIZATION OF POLYIMIDE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL DISPLAY RESEARCH CONFERENCE JAPAN DISPLAY, (19940101), pages 213 - 216, XP000646416 [X] 1,5 * figure 2 * [A] 9 | Examination | WO9517303 | US2982178 | US5311217 | JPH08262367 | US5760963 | US4998191 |