EP0913646 - Cooking oven with cooled lighting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2004/05] |
Former [1999/18] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mallinger, Peter Dipl.-Ing Im Waldfeld 8 83301 Traunreut / DE | 02 /
Kellermann, Peter Piracherstrasse 28 84489 Burghausen / DE | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | Daub, Thomas Daub Patent- & Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Goldbacher Strasse 60 88662 Überlingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98120424.1 | 28.10.1998 | [1999/18] | Priority number, date | DE1997148002 | 30.10.1997 Original published format: DE 19748002 | [1999/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0913646 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0913646 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/00 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
F24C15/006 (EP);
F24C15/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT, NL, SE [2000/03] |
Former [1999/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Herd mit gekühlter Beleuchtungseinrichtung | [1999/18] | English: | Cooking oven with cooled lighting device | [1999/18] | French: | Cuisinière à dispositif d'éclairage refroidi | [1999/18] | Examination procedure | 02.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/44] | 05.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.09.2002
13.04.2005
WITHDRAWN Miele & Cie. GmbH & Co. Schutzrechte/Verträge Carl-Miele-Strasse 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.09.2002
13.04.2005
WITHDRAWN Miele & Cie. GmbH & Co. Schutzrechte/Verträge Carl-Miele-Strasse 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | ||
Former [2002/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.09.2002
17.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE Miele & Cie. GmbH & Co. Schutzrechte/Verträge Carl-Miele-Strasse 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | 25.10.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.05.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.12.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.03.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 22.05.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.05.2007 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2007/33] | 12.06.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 17.03.2005 | Appeal received No. T0371/05 | 14.07.2005 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.05.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 19.12.2001 | NL | 19.12.2001 | SE | 19.03.2002 | ES | 27.06.2002 | [2008/12] |
Former [2004/04] | NL | 19.12.2001 | |
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 19.12.2001 | |
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 19.03.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]DE29718343U (BROEKELMANN JAEGER & BUSSE [DE]) [PX] 1-3,7 * figure -; claims 1-4 *; | [DA]EP0454969 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) | by applicant | EP0454969 |