EP0917854 - Non-contact non-invasive measuring method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.2001 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.08.2001 [2001/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyoto Dai-ichi Kagaku Co., Ltd. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo, Minato-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601 / JP | For all designated states Kurashiki Boseki Kabushiki Kaisha 7-1, Hommachi Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/21] | For all designated states Kyoto Dai-ichi Kagaku Co., Ltd. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo, Minato-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601 / JP | ||
For all designated states Kurashiki Boseki Kabushiki Kaisha 7-1, Hommachi Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kexin, Xu c/o Kyoto Dai-ichi Kagaku Co., Ltd. 57, Nishiaketa-cho, Higashikujo, Minami-ku Kyoto 601 / JP | [1999/21] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/21] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Schoppe & Zimmermann Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98120518.0 | 29.10.1998 | [1999/21] | Priority number, date | JP19970337913 | 21.11.1997 Original published format: JP 33791397 | [1999/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0917854 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0917854 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | [1999/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, G01N21/01, G01B11/27 | [1999/30] | CPC: |
A61B5/0073 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/21] | A61B5/00, G01N21/01 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/14] |
Former [1999/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Berührungsloses, nichtinvasives Messverfahren und dazu geeignete Vorrichtung | [1999/21] | English: | Non-contact non-invasive measuring method and apparatus | [1999/21] | French: | Procédé non invasif de mesure sans contact et dispositif pour sa mise en oeuvre | [1999/21] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/11] | 20.06.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08299310 ; | [A]US4701049 (BECKMAN LEO H J F [NL], et al) [A] 7 * column 1, line 10 - line 31 * * figure 4 *; | [A]US5436455 (ROSENTHAL ROBERT D [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * abstract * * column 4, line 37 - line 51 * * column 5, line 45 - line 60 * * column 7, line 53 - line 57 * * figure 8 *; | [A]US5572313 (ZHENG WENXIN [SE], et al) [A] 8* abstract *; | [YA]EP0795293 (KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU KK [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,4 * abstract * * column 3, line 18 - line 24 * * column 3, line 43 - line 55 * * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 2 * * column 10, line 36 - column 11, line 21 * * column 12, line 24 - line 52 * * figures 8-10 * [A] 5,10,11; | [DYA]EP0801297 (KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU KK [JP], et al) [DY] 1,2,4 * abstract * * column 1, line 34 - line 38 * * column 6, line 15 - line 43 * * column 10, line 14 - line 28 * * column 11, line 12 - line 22 * * column 12, line 56 - line 5 * * figure 1 * [A] 5,6,10,11; | US5769076 [ ] (MAEKAWA YASUNORI [JP], et al) [ ] * abstract * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 22 * * column 3, line 30 - line 41 * * column 4, line 34 - line 37 * * column 4, line 45 - line 50 * * column 6, line 55 - line 60 * * figure 6 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 097, no. 003, & JP08299310 A 19961119 (TOA MEDICAL ELECTRONICS CO LTD;ISHIHARA KEN) [A] 1,4,6,11 * abstract * |