EP0926210 - Silicon oxide bearing on its surface partially or completely sylilated polysilicic acids chains [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker Chemie AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [2006/04] |
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states Wacker-Chemie GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barthel, Herbert, Dr. Lessingstrasse 13 84547 Emmerting / DE | 02 /
Heinemann, Mario, Dr. Leibnitzstrasse 23 84489 Burghausen / DE | [1999/26] | Representative(s) | Fritz, Helmut, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | Fritz, Helmut, Dr., et al Wacker-Chemie GmbH, Zentralabteilung Patente, Marken und Lizenzen, Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98120679.0 | 05.11.1998 | [1999/26] | Priority number, date | DE1997156831 | 19.12.1997 Original published format: DE 19756831 | [1999/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0926210 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0926210 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/10] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0926210 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/30, C08F292/00, C08K9/08, G03G9/08 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
C08F292/00 (EP,US);
C08K9/08 (EP,US);
C09C1/3081 (EP,US);
G03G9/09716 (EP,US);
G03G9/09725 (EP,US);
C01P2004/80 (US);
C01P2006/12 (US);
Y10T428/2991 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2993 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2998 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K9/08, C08L83/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/10] |
Former [1999/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Siliciumoxid, das an seiner Oberfläche teil- oder vollständig silylierte Polykieselsäureketten trägt | [1999/26] | English: | Silicon oxide bearing on its surface partially or completely sylilated polysilicic acids chains | [1999/26] | French: | Oxyde de silicium portant en surface des chaînes d'acides polysiliciques partiellement ou complètement silylées | [1999/26] | Examination procedure | 05.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/26] | 05.11.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 09.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 09.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.12.2002
18.12.2002
ADMISSIBLE Degussa AG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE | [2009/26] |
Former [2003/05] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.12.2002
Degussa Ag Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE Opponent's representative Weber, Wolfgang, Dr. c/o Degussa AG, Intellectual Property Management, Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 20.01.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.07.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.11.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.11.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.11.2005 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 29.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 22.12.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.01.2010 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 09.06.2010 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 29.12.2005 | Appeal received No. T0019/06 | 16.03.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.07.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 17.07.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.08.2007 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 06.11.2008 | CH | 30.11.2008 | LI | 30.11.2008 | [2010/19] |
Former [2010/05] | CH | 30.11.2008 | |
LI | 30.11.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2635782 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1,5,13 * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 1 *; | [A]EP0342025 (DOW CORNING [US]) [A] 1,5,13 * claims 1-4 *; | [A]FR2211516 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,5 * page 11, paragraph L - page 13, paragraph 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0460665 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 12 * claims 1,4 * | Opposition | DE4240741 | EP0378785 | DE3839900 |