EP0915423 - Computer operation management system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8010 / JP | ||
Former [1999/19] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirata, Toshiaki 6-13, Kikkodaicho-2-chome Kashiwa-shi / JP | 02 /
Urano, Akihiro 5977-1-II-113 Tsujido Fujisawa-shi / JP | 03 /
Fujino, Shuji 1051-F305, Kamigo Ebina-shi / JP | 04 /
Matsumura, Eiji 39-5-504, Miyamotocho-2-chome, Minami-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | [1999/19] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [1999/19] | Application number, filing date | 98120838.2 | 03.11.1998 | [1999/19] | Priority number, date | JP19970306067 | 07.11.1997 Original published format: JP 30606797 | [1999/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0915423 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0915423 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | [2004/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0915423 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/34 | [1999/19] | CPC: |
G06F11/3055 (EP,US);
G06F11/3006 (EP,US);
G06F11/3072 (EP,US);
G06F11/328 (EP,US);
G06F11/3495 (EP,US);
G06F11/2273 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/10] |
Former [1999/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verwaltungssystem zur Computerbedienung | [1999/19] | English: | Computer operation management system | [1999/19] | French: | Système de gestion pour l'opération d'un ordinateur | [1999/19] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 13.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9527249 (INTEL CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,7,8 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * page 8, line 1 - page 10, line 12 * * page 11, line 4 - line 13 * * page 13, line 1 - page 46, line 9 * [Y] 5; | [A]US5559955 (DEV ROGER H [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * column 3, line 63 - column 5, line 43 * * column 7, line 60 - column 9, line 38 * * column 12, line 6 - column 13, line 13 * * figures 1-13 *; | [A]JPH0950386 | [YA] - JONG KIM ET AL, "PROCESS ALLOCATION FOR LOAD DISTRIBUTION IN FAULT-TOLERANT MULTICOMPUTERS", 25TH. INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON FAULT TOLERANT COMPUTING. DIGEST OF PAPERS. PASADENA, JUNE 27 - 30, 1995, INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON FAULT TOLERANT COMPUTING, LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, (19950627), vol. SYMP. 25, ISBN 0-7803-2965-1, pages 174 - 183, XP000597790 [Y] 5 * page 174, column L, line 1 - page 175, column L, line L * [A] 6 | [A] - FERIDUN M ET AL, "ANM: AUTOMATED NETWORK MANAGEMENT SYSTEM", IEEE NETWORK, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19880301), vol. 2, no. 2, ISSN 0890-8044, pages 13 - 19, XP000608853 [A] 1-7 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/65.3254 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 1997, no. 06, & JP09050386 A 19970218 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,7,8 * the whole document * |