EP0924519 - Process for the determination of a dosing regimen for thrombin inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/25] | Process for determining of a dosage regime for thrombin inhibitors | ||
[2005/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbott GmbH & Co. KG Max-Planck-Ring 2 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | [2006/01] |
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states Abbott GmbH & Co. KG Max-Planck-Ring 2 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states KNOLL AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Knollstrasse 16-20 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nörtersheuser, Peter Dr. Am alten Weg 24a 55127 Mainz / DE | 02 /
Kreis, Siegfried Buttstädterstrasse 8 67251 Freinsheim / DE | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98121054.5 | 06.11.1998 | [1999/25] | Priority number, date | DE1997155682 | 15.12.1997 Original published format: DE 19755682 | [1999/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0924519 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0924519 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | [2001/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0924519 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/48, G01N33/86, G06F19/00, A61K38/58 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
A61K38/58 (EP,US);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/25] | G01N33/48 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2002/29] |
Former [1999/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Ermittlung eines Dosierungsschemas für Thrombininhibitoren | [1999/25] | English: | Process for the determination of a dosing regimen for thrombin inhibitors | [2005/23] | French: | Procédé de détermination d'un régime posologique pour inhibiteurs de thrombine | [2005/23] |
Former [1999/25] | Process for determining of a dosage regime for thrombin inhibitors | ||
Former [1999/25] | Procédé pour déterminer un régime dosage pour les inhibiteurs de thrombine | Examination procedure | 13.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/02] | 01.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   24.04.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 15.04.2006 | [2008/12] |
Former [2007/17] | ES | 15.04.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO9316390 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE]) [AD] 1-5 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph L - page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 8, paragraph L - page 9, paragraph 2 *; | [Y] - POETZSCH B ET AL, "MONITORING OF RECOMBINANT HIRUDIN: ASSESSMENT OF A PLASMA-BASED ECARIN CLOTTING TIME ASSAY", THROMBOSIS RESEARCH,TARRYTOWN, NY,US, (19970601), vol. 86, no. 5, ISSN 0049-3848, pages 373 - 383, XP001000734 [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * page 374, paragraph 2 * * page 380, paragraph L - page 382, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0049-3848(97)00082-0 | [Y] - WAKEFIELD J ET AL, "AN APPLICATION OF BAYESIAN POPULATION PHARMACOKINETIC/PHARMACODYNAMIC MODELS TO DOSE RECOMMENDATION", STATISTICS IN MEDICINE, WILEY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199505), vol. 14, no. 9/10, ISSN 0277-6715, pages 971 - 986, XP001008622 [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * page 972, paragraph 2 - page 985 * | [Y] - MUNGALL D R ET AL, "A PROSPECTIVE RANDOMIZED COMPARISON OF THE ACCURACY OF COMPUTER-ASSISTED VERSUS GUSTO NOMOGRAM-DIRECTED HEPARIN THERAPY", CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY & THERAPEUTICS, MOSBY-YEAR BOOK, ST LOUIS, MO, US, (199405), vol. 55, ISSN 0009-9236, pages 591 - 596, XP001008447 [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * page 591, column L, paragraph 1 - page 592, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 592, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 593, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 1 * * Appendix * | [A] - GOMENI R ET AL, "POPULATION KINETICS AND CONDITIONAL ASSESSMENT OF THE OPTIMAL DOSAGE REGIMEN USING THE P-PHARM SOFTWARE PACKAGE", ANTICANCER RESEARCH, HELENIC ANTICANCER INSTITUTE, ATHENS,, GR, (19941108), vol. 14, ISSN 0250-7005, pages 2321 - 2326, XP001008384 [A] 1-5 * abstract * * page 2324, column R, paragraph 4 - page 2326, column L * |