EP0918075 - Heat stable yellow iron oxide pigments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2003/08] |
Former [1999/21] | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burow, Wilfried Dr. Glindholzstrasse 100 47809 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
Oehlert, Wolfgang Dr. 8, Alpine Ct. Wheeling, WV 26003-9357 / US | [1999/21] | Application number, filing date | 98121058.6 | 06.11.1998 | [1999/21] | Priority number, date | DE1997151142 | 19.11.1997 Original published format: DE 19751142 | [1999/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0918075 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0918075 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | [1999/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0918075 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/24, C08K3/00, D21H17/67, C04B14/30, C09D7/12 | [1999/21] | CPC: |
C09D5/035 (EP,KR,US);
C09C1/24 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/11 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/22 (EP,KR,US);
C09C3/08 (KR);
C09D7/48 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/35] |
Former [1999/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hitzestabile Eisenoxidgelb-Pigmente | [1999/21] | English: | Heat stable yellow iron oxide pigments | [1999/21] | French: | Pigments d'oxyde de fer jaune stables à la chaleur | [1999/21] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 29.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4374677 (SENDA JIHEI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-9* column W *; | [AD]US4376656 (SENDA JIHEI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-9 * column W *; | [A]EP0221473 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |