EP0916886 - Fitting for fluid conveying pipings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.2004 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURRAY EUROPE S.p.A. Via Boccaccio, 1 I-20090 Trezzano S/N (Milano) / IT | [1999/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Perotti, Alessandro via Boccaccio 1 20090 Trezzano S/N (MI) / IT | [1999/20] | Representative(s) | Lecce, Giovanni Lecce & Calciati S.r.l. Internazionale Brevetti Via Monte Rosa, 14 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/20] | Lecce, Giovanni Dott. Giovanni Lecce & C. S.r.l. Via G. Negri 10 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 98121096.6 | 06.11.1998 | [1999/20] | Priority number, date | IT1997MI00814U | 17.11.1997 Original published format: IT MI970814 U | IT1998MI00724 | 03.04.1998 Original published format: IT MI980724 | [1999/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0916886 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0916886 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0916886 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16L21/035 | [1999/20] | CPC: |
F16L23/18 (EP);
F16L21/035 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2000/41] |
Former [1999/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbindungsstück für Rohrleitungen | [1999/20] | English: | Fitting for fluid conveying pipings | [1999/20] | French: | Raccord pour conduits | [1999/20] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 19.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2042116 (INTERPACE CORP) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]CH412487 (MÜCHER) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US3990730 (EKMAN B THURE F) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE7104371U (JUNKERS & CO) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 * |