EP0918057 - Carbamoyl substituted acetals and compositions containing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILLIKEN RESEARCH CORPORATION Post Office Box 1927 920 Milliken Road Spartanburg South Carolina 29304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/21] | For all designated states MILLIKEN RESEARCH CORPORATION Post Office Box 1927 920 Milliken Road Spartanburg South Carolina 29304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carroll, Charles C. 321 Weblin Street Spartanburg, SC 29301 / US | 02 /
Mehl, Nathan A. 253 Preston Drive Moore, SC 29369 / US | 03 /
Miley, John W. 340 Waldrop Road Campobello, SC 29322 / US | 04 /
Salley, Joseph M. 510 Bent Creek Lane Spartanburg, SC 29306 / US | 05 /
Lever, John G. 185 Edgecombe Road Spartanburg, SC 29307 / US | [1999/21] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/21] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98121165.9 | 12.11.1998 | [1999/21] | Priority number, date | US19970130921 | 26.11.1997 Original published format: US 130921 | [1999/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0918057 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0918057 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07D493/04, C08K5/15, C08K5/205, // (C07D493/04, 319:00, 319:00) | [1999/21] | CPC: |
C07D493/04 (EP,US);
C08K5/0008 (EP,US);
C08K5/0083 (EP,US);
C08K5/205 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/05] |
Former [1999/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Carbamoylsubstituierte Acetale und diese enthaltende Zusammensetzungen | [1999/21] | English: | Carbamoyl substituted acetals and compositions containing the same | [1999/21] | French: | Acétals substitués par des groupes carbamoyles et compositions les contenant | [1999/21] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/35] | 29.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 12.09.2001 | FR | 12.09.2001 | IT | 12.09.2001 | DE | 13.12.2001 | ES | 26.03.2002 | [2008/12] |
Former [2004/35] | BE | 12.09.2001 | |
FR | 12.09.2001 | ||
DE | 13.12.2001 | ||
ES | 26.03.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | BE | 12.09.2001 | |
DE | 13.12.2001 | ||
ES | 26.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | BE | 12.09.2001 | |
DE | 13.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/29] | BE | 12.09.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0421634 (MILLIKEN RES CORP [US]) [A] 1,8,14-17 * examples 1-9; claims 1,6 *; | [D]US5049605 (REKERS JOHN W [US]); | [AD]US5198484 (MANNION MICHAEL J [US]) [AD] 1,8,14-17 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 49; claims 1,18 *; | [A]US4371645 (MAHAFFEY JR ROBERT L) [A] 1,8,14-17 * example -; claim 1 *; | [AD]US4314039 (KAWAI YOICHI, et al) [AD] 1,8,14-17 * column 3, line 9 - column 5, line 20; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0632091 (HIMONT INC [US]) [A] 1,8,14-17 * example -; claims 1,8 *; | [A]EP0507950 (NEW JAPAN CHEM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,8 * claim 1 *; | [AD]EP0497976 (NEW JAPAN CHEM CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1,8 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0463588 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 8,14-17 * claim - *; | [A]JPH03210382 ; | [AD]JPH06256590 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911209), vol. 15, no. 484, Database accession no. (C - 0892), & JP03210382 A 19910913 (NEW JAPAN CHEM CO LLTD) [A] 8,14-17 * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941213), vol. 18, no. 656, Database accession no. (C - 1286), & JP06256590 A 19940913 (NEW JAPAN CHEM CO LTD) [AD] 14 * abstract * |