EP0917186 - Integrated capacitors for microwave circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.12.2003 [2003/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/20] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishimura, Takeshi B. NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Iwata, Naotaka NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1999/20] | Representative(s) | Splanemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/20] | Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann Dr. B. Reitzner Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98121226.9 | 06.11.1998 | [1999/20] | Priority number, date | JP19970307256 | 10.11.1997 Original published format: JP 30725697 | [1999/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0917186 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0917186 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | [2001/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/3205, H01L27/06, H01L21/02, H01L21/28, H01L21/70 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
H01L27/0688 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/0629 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1999/20] | H01L21/3205, H01L27/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/18] |
Former [1999/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Integrierte Kondensatoren für Mikrowellenschaltungen | [1999/20] | English: | Integrated capacitors for microwave circuits | [1999/20] | French: | Condensateur intégré pour des dispositifs hyperfréquence | [1999/20] | Examination procedure | 10.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 06.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH07221268 ; | [Y]JPH08139273 ; | [Y]US5304506 (PORTER STEPHEN R [US], et al) [Y] 1,4* column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 15; figure 3 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, & JP07221268 A 19950818 (FUJITSU LTD) [Y] 1,4 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960930), vol. 1996, no. 09, & JP08139273 A 19960531 (SONY CORP) [Y] 1,4 * abstract * |