EP0917860 - Device for dental prosthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Purner, Helmut Fasaneriestrasse 8 5020 Salzburg / AT | [1999/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/21] | Representative(s) | LS-MP von Puttkamer Berngruber Loth Spuhler Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB ALPHA-Haus Garmischer Strasse 35 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/21] | Haft, von Puttkamer, Berngruber, Czybulka Patentanwälte Franziskanerstrasse 38 81669 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98121367.1 | 10.11.1998 | [1999/21] | Priority number, date | DE1997151999 | 24.11.1997 Original published format: DE 19751999 | [1999/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0917860 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0917860 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | [2002/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0917860 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/20, A61C13/267, A61C13/265, A61C13/275, A61C5/08 | [1999/21] | CPC: |
A61C13/225 (EP,US);
A61C13/20 (EP);
A61C13/26 (EP);
A61C13/267 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/21] | Extension states | AL | 17.07.2002 | LT | 17.07.2002 | LV | 17.07.2002 | MK | 17.07.2002 | RO | 17.07.2002 | SI | 17.07.2002 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Zahnersatz | [1999/21] | English: | Device for dental prosthesis | [1999/21] | French: | Dispositif pour prothèse dentaire | [1999/21] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 05.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 23.04.2003 | CY | 10.11.2003 | LU | 30.11.2003 | [2008/24] |
Former [2007/17] | CY | 10.11.2003 | |
LU | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | CY | 10.11.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2107931 (DAUB HANS) [A] 1,2,4,5,9 * page 2, lines 1-15 * * page 3, lines 1-18 * * figures 1-9 *; | [A]US4259073 (EMMONS JAMES D) [A] 1,3,4,9 * column 2, lines 23-43 * * column 4, lines 10-55 * * column 6, lines 4-21 * * figures 1-14 *; | [A]US4731020 (KAWAHARA HARUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7,9 * column 1, lines 1-15 * * column 4, lines 23-61 * * column 5, lines 7-52 * * column 6, lines 43-65 * * figures 1-11 *; | [DA]DE4420044 (PURNER HELMUT [AT]) [DA] 1,2,8 * column 2, lines 1-14 * * column 3, lines 7-25 * * figures 1-8 *; | [XA]EP0687451 (DENTSPLY DETREY GMBH [DE]) [X] 10 * page 4, lines 11-58 * * figures 1A-6 *[A] 1,9; | [A]EP0790044 (HOWMEDICA [US]) [A] 1,8-10 * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 19 * * column 7, lines 2-7 * * column 7, line 57 - column 8, line 4 * * column 9, lines 11-23 * | by applicant | DE4420044 |