EP0916958 - Method for the testing of an inductive resonant circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/20] | Test method for an inductive resonant circuit | ||
[2001/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.A. 29, Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2001/51] |
Former [1999/20] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics SA 7, avenue Gallieni 94250 Gentilly Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Enguent, Jean-Pierre 6, Place de la Libération, LA VALENTINE 13119 Saint Savournin / FR | [1999/20] | Representative(s) | Bentz, Jean-Paul, et al Novagraaf Technologies 122 Rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Bentz, Jean-Paul, et al Novagraaf Technologies 122 Rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2002/31] | Bentz, Jean-Paul, et al Cabinet Ballot 9 Boulevard de Strasbourg 83000 Toulon / FR | ||
Former [1999/20] | Ballot, Paul Denis Jacques Cabinet Ballot-Schmit, 9, boulevard de Strasbourg 83000 Toulon / FR | Application number, filing date | 98121545.2 | 17.11.1998 | [1999/20] | Priority number, date | FR19970014687 | 18.11.1997 Original published format: FR 9714687 | [1999/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0916958 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0916958 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/315, G01R31/04 | [1999/20] | CPC: |
G01R31/315 (EP,US);
G01R31/67 (EP,US);
H04B17/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/04] |
Former [1999/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Prüfen einer induktiven Resonanzschaltung | [2001/21] | English: | Method for the testing of an inductive resonant circuit | [2001/21] | French: | Procédé de test d'un circuit résonant inductif | [1999/20] |
Former [1999/20] | Prüfverfahren einer induktiven resonanten Schaltung | ||
Former [1999/20] | Test method for an inductive resonant circuit | Examination procedure | 24.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 25.06.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 28.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 20.11.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 01.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.12.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 26.09.2001 | IT | 26.09.2001 | [2008/12] |
Former [2002/37] | GB | 26.09.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4392106 (YAKOVLEV NIKOLAI I [SU], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 2; figure 1 *; | [A]US5631572 (SHEEN TIMOTHY W [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim 11 *; | [A]JPH0647513 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940524), vol. 018, no. 272, Database accession no. (M - 1610), & JP06047513 A 19940222 (SUMITOMO LIGHT METAL IND LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |