EP0921008 - Method for compensating the tolerance in an ink jet print head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.2003 [2003/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Francotyp-Postalia AG & Co. KG Triftweg 21-26 16547 Birkenwerder / DE | [2002/28] |
Former [1999/23] | For all designated states Francotyp-Postalia AG & Co. Triftweg 21-26 16547 Birkenwerder / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Böhm, Uwe Koppenstrasse 18 10243 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Günther, Stephan Forstweg 63a 13465 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Thiel, Wolfgang Dr. Bohnsackersteig 8 13503 Berlin / DE | [1999/23] | Application number, filing date | 98121717.7 | 14.11.1998 | [1999/23] | Priority number, date | DE1997155874 | 04.12.1997 Original published format: DE 19755874 | [1999/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0921008 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0921008 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/51 | [1999/23] | CPC: |
B41J25/003 (EP,US);
B41J2202/14 (EP,US);
B41J2202/17 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2000/08] |
Former [1999/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Toleranzausgleich bei einem Tintendruckkopf | [1999/23] | English: | Method for compensating the tolerance in an ink jet print head | [1999/23] | French: | Procédé compensateur de tolérance dans une tête d'impression à jet d'encre | [1999/23] | Examination procedure | 09.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/36] | 02.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0257570 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1,3,4* column 3, line 24 - column 6, line 51; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]WO9507185 (XAAR LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-4 * page 17, lines 12-21; figure 11 *; | [Y]DE19511416 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 12; figure 4 *; | [Y]EP0775587 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 1-4 * column 3, line 42 - column 8, line 37; figures 3-5 * |