EP0919302 - Roll bending machine with selective digital control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2002 [2002/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROMAU S.R.L. Via Civinelli 1150 47020 Cesena (Forli) / IT | [1999/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davi, Orazio Maria Via Civinelli, 1150 47020 Cesena (FO) / IT | [1999/22] | Representative(s) | Coloberti, Luigi Luppi Intellectual Property Srl Via De Amicis, 25 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | Coloberti, Luigi Via E. de Amicis No. 25 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 98122132.8 | 24.11.1998 | [1999/22] | Priority number, date | IT1997MI02637 | 27.11.1997 Original published format: IT MI972637 | [1999/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0919302 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0919302 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | [2001/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B21D5/14 | [1999/22] | CPC: |
B21D5/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2001/42] |
Former [1999/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Walzenbiegemaschine mit numerischer Steuereinrichtung | [1999/22] | English: | Roll bending machine with selective digital control device | [1999/22] | French: | Cintreuse à rouleaux à commande numérique | [1999/22] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/20] | 11.12.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.09.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.09.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 24.09.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0477752 (PROMAU SRL [IT]) [YD] 1-3 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]US4140953 (DUNNE MAURICE J) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2204426 (HAUNI WERKE KOERBER & CO KG) [A] 2-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US4380796 (OSTBY LYLE D) [A] 2-5 * the whole document * |