EP1004703 - Multi-ply tissue, and process for its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hörner, Thomas Schlossstrasse 12 65719 Hofheim / DE | 02 /
Loughran, Scott Thomas Sperberstrasse, 111 65812 Bad Soden/Ts / DE | 03 /
Malmbak, Marianne Pfahlgrabenstrasse 17 65510 Idstein-Eschenhahn / DE | 04 /
Werth, Anja Finkenhofstrasse 42 60322 Frankfurt Main / DE | [2000/22] | Representative(s) | Mather, Peter Geoffrey, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Mather, Peter Geoffrey, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH, Sulzbacherstrasse 40 65824 Schwalbach/Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2000/22] | Mather, Peter Geoffrey, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH 65823 Schwalbach/Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 98122328.2 | 24.11.1998 | [2000/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1004703 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D21H27/30, D21F11/00 | [2000/22] | CPC: |
D21F11/006 (EP);
D21H1/02 (KR);
D21F11/14 (EP);
D21H27/30 (EP);
D21H21/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2001/06] |
Former [2000/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mehrlagiges Seidenpapier, und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [2000/22] | English: | Multi-ply tissue, and process for its manufacture | [2000/22] | French: | Papier de soie multicouche et son procédé de fabrication | [2000/22] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 07.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 06.08.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5397435 (OSTENDORF WARD W [US], et al) [A] 1-10* examples 3,4 *; | [X]US5667637 (JEWELL RICHARD A [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 19; figure 7; table 1 *; | [DA]US5679222 (RASCH DAVID MARK [US], et al) |