EP0915313 - Fin tube heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.2004 [2004/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BABCOCK-HITACHI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 6-2, 2-chome, Ohtemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [1999/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shigenaka, Toshinori Kure Works Babcock-Hitachi KK, 6-9 Takara-machi Kure-shi, Hiroshima 737 / JP | 02 /
Mimura, Tetsuo Kure Works Babcock-Hitachi KK, 6-9 Takara-machi Kure-shi, Hiroshima 737 / JP | 03 /
Machida, Yukitaka Kure Works Babcock-Hitachi KK, 6-9 Takara-machi Kure-shi, Hiroshima 737 / JP | 04 /
Kohtaka, Ikuo Kure Works Babcock-Hitachi KK, 6-9 Takara-machi Kure-shi, Hiroshima 737 / JP | 05 /
Marumoto, Takahiro Kure Res Lab Babcock-Hitachi KK, 3-36 Takara-machi Kure-shi, Hiroshima 737 / JP | [1999/19] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/19] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98122556.8 | 20.07.1994 | [1999/19] | Priority number, date | JP19930180495 | 21.07.1993 Original published format: JP 18049593 | [1999/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0915313 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0915313 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | [1999/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0915313 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP0915313 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F28F1/36 | [1999/19] | CPC: |
F28F1/36 (EP,US);
F28F1/32 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1999/19] | Title | German: | Rippenrohr- Wärmeaustauscher | [1999/19] | English: | Fin tube heat exchanger | [1999/19] | French: | Echangeur de chaleur à tubes à ailettes | [1999/19] | Examination procedure | 22.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 23.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94921795.4 / EP0660062 | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/09] | Request for further processing for: | 02.05.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 02.05.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.05.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US1932610 (FROST TILLEY EDWIN) [DA] 1,3 * page 1, line 59 - line 86; figures 1-3,5,7 * | Examination | US3652820 | JPH04126997 |