EP0921235 - Shoring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emunds & Staudinger GmbH Ottostrasse 30 D-41836 Hückelhoven / DE | [1999/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
May, Helmut Staufenstrasse 17 41849 Wassenberg / DE | [1999/23] | Representative(s) | Freischem, Werner Patentanwälte Freischem Salierring 47-53 50677 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/23] | Freischem, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Freischem, An Gross St. Martin 2 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 98122854.7 | 02.12.1998 | [1999/23] | Priority number, date | DE1997153561 | 03.12.1997 Original published format: DE 19753561 | [1999/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0921235 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0921235 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E02D17/08 | [1999/23] | CPC: |
E02D17/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/10] |
Former [2000/08] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL | ||
Former [1999/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbauvorrichtung | [1999/23] | English: | Shoring device | [1999/23] | French: | Dispositif de blindage | [1999/23] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 10.12.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 21.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.01.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.12.2002 | LI | 31.12.2002 | [2004/01] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0046553 (KOTEX IND HANDEL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,4-6 * page 6, line 33 - page 11, line 35; figures 1-14 *; | [DA]EP0100083 (EMUNDS & STAUDINGER GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * page 3, line 16 - page 7, line 36; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE9012301U (HESS) [A] 1,4-6* the whole document *; | [A]DE29616986U (SBH TIEFBAUTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,4-6 * page 4, line 32 - page 7, line 13; figure 1 * | by applicant | EP0100083 |