EP0960790 - Height-adjustable guide loop for seat belts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2000 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.03.2000 [2000/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R. SCHMIDT GMBH Dr. Paul-Müller-Strasse 36 57368 Lennestadt / DE | [1999/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lohmann, Horst Kreuzberg 11 59846 Sundern / DE | 02 /
Stenzel, Wolfgang Am Papelöhr 27 59889 Cobbenrode / DE | 03 /
Rau, Dirk In der Schlade 3 57413 Finnentrop / DE | [1999/48] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Fleyer Strasse 135 58097 Hagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Conrad Köchling Dipl.-Ing. Conrad-Joachim Köchling Fleyer Strasse 135 58097 Hagen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98122858.8 | 02.12.1998 | [1999/48] | Priority number, date | DE1998123799 | 28.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19823799 | [1999/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0960790 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/20 | [1999/48] | CPC: |
B60R22/201 (EP);
B60R2021/0006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Höhenverstellbarer Umlenkbeschlag für Sicherheitsgurte | [1999/48] | English: | Height-adjustable guide loop for seat belts | [1999/48] | French: | Ferrure de renvoi réglable en hauteur pour ceintures de sécurité | [1999/48] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2513887 (AUTOFLUG GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4 * page 13, line 14 - page 16, line 17; figures 14-20 *; | [Y]FR2261023 (BRITAX LONDON LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,2,4,5 * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 40; figures 3,4 *; | [Y]GB1599643 (BRITAX WINGARD LTD) [Y] 1,2,4,5 * page 2, line 82 - line 126; figures 8-10 *; | [A]EP0180306 (ASE UK LTD [GB]) [A] 1,4 * page 6, line 28 - page 11, line 9; figures 1-7 *; | [A]DE9111367U (GRIESEMER GMBH) [A] 1-4 * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 7; figure - * | by applicant | DE3618973 |