EP0923981 - Oxidation catalyst for combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMG AG & Co. KG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau / DE | [2001/46] |
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states dmc2 Degussa Metals Catalysts Cerdec AG 60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1999/36] | For all designated states Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft 60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft 45764 Marl / DE | ||
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klein, Harald Dr. Otto-Sauer-Strasse 17a 63856 Bessenbach / DE | 02 /
van den Tillaart, Hans Dr. Schillerstrasse 30 63579 Freigericht / DE | 03 /
Eckhoff, Stephan Zum Pageskampe 24 31515 Wunstorf / DE | 04 /
Lox, Egbert Dr. Greifenhagenstrasse 12b 63457 Hanau / DE | 05 /
Kreuzer, Thomas Dr. Philipp-Reis-Strasse 13 61184 Karben / DE | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Reinhard OMG AG FI-PAT Postfach 1351 63403 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | Herrmann, Reinhard OMG AG FI-PAT Postfach 1351 63403 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 98122920.6 | 02.12.1998 | [1999/25] | Priority number, date | DE1997156144 | 17.12.1997 Original published format: DE 19756144 | [1999/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0923981 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0923981 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | [2000/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/94, B01J23/62 | [1999/25] | CPC: |
B01D53/945 (EP,US);
B01J23/626 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y10S502/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/42] |
Former [1999/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Oxydationskatalysator für Verbrennungsmotoren | [1999/25] | English: | Oxidation catalyst for combustion engines | [1999/25] | French: | Catalyseur d'oxidation pour les moteurs à combustion | [1999/25] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 13.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/23] | 07.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3425792 (STEPHENS RUTH E) [X] 1-3 * column W *; | [X]JPS4993267 ; | [X]EP0211233 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [X] 1-3 * examples 10-8,13,15-10; claim 10; tables 2,3 *; | [X]JPH05103985 ; | [X]EP0362960 (SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO [JP]) [X] 1-3 * example 11 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1975, no. 22, Database accession no. 1975-36533W, XP002125142 & JPS4993267 A 19740905 (ASAHI CHEM IND CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 21, Database accession no. 1993-171962, XP002125143 & JPH05103985 A 19930427 (NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract * |