EP0921240 - Truss structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. Südstrasse 125 53175 Bonn / DE | [1999/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schütze, Rainer, Dr. Am Klei 14a 38110 Braunschweig / DE | 02 /
Götting, Hans-Christian Danzinger Strasse 9 38108 Braunschweig / DE | [1999/23] | Representative(s) | Einsel, Martin Patentanwälte Einsel & Kollegen Jasperallee 1a 38102 Braunschweig / DE | [2008/39] |
Former [1999/23] | Einsel, Martin, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt, Jasperallee 1A 38102 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 98122926.3 | 03.12.1998 | [1999/23] | Priority number, date | DE1997153545 | 03.12.1997 Original published format: DE 19753545 | [1999/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0921240 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0921240 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/58, B64D27/26 | [2000/13] | CPC: |
B64D27/18 (EP);
E04B1/98 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/23] | E04B1/58 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/49] |
Former [1999/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Fachwerkstruktur | [1999/23] | English: | Truss structure | [1999/23] | French: | Structure en treillis | [1999/23] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/31] | 18.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.11.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.11.2000 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3873219 (POFFERI GIANCARLO) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 33; figures 1-5 *; | [A]FR764441 (RUISSEAU) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2692631 (SPM INTERNATIONAL [FR]) [A] 1,2 * page 2, line 40 - page 5, line 27; figure - *; | [A]DE1073316 (ROLLS-ROYCE LIMITED); | [A]DE4310825 (DEUTSCHE FORSCH LUFT RAUMFAHRT [DE]) | by applicant | DE9317923U | DE9318280U | DE8706885U | DE3805529 | DE9314402U |