EP0928053 - Patch panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADC GmbH Beeskowdamm 3-11 14167 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states ADC GmbH Beeskowdamm 3-11 14167 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states KRONE GmbH Beeskowdamm 3-11 14167 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states KRONE GmbH Beeskowdamm 3-11 14167 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1999/27] | For all designated states KRONE Aktiengesellschaft Beeskowdamm 3-11 14167 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lorscheider, Jörg 33462 Coral Reach Street Dana Point, CA 92629 / US | 02 /
Zalesky, Dean R. 243 Oneider Street Denver, CO 80220 / US | 03 /
Lotinsky, Peter J. 2874 S. Wabash Circle Denver, CO 80231 / US | [1999/27] | Application number, filing date | 98123266.3 | 07.12.1998 | [1999/27] | Priority number, date | US19970001914 | 31.12.1997 Original published format: US 1914 | [1999/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0928053 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0928053 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | [2001/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02G11/02, H04Q1/14 | [1999/27] | CPC: |
B65H75/4449 (EP,US);
B65H75/44 (EP,US);
H02G11/02 (EP,US);
H04Q1/066 (EP,US);
H04Q1/068 (EP,US);
H04Q1/13 (EP,US);
H04Q2201/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/27] | Title | German: | Schalttafel | [1999/27] | English: | Patch panel | [1999/27] | French: | Tableau de commutation | [1999/27] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 16.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/52] | 05.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   07.02.2002 | 31.12.2007 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3821496 (DE TROY MALONE) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [XA]US5168969 (MAYHEW JOSEPH C [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-8; | [A]FR2701345 (CONSTANT MICHEL [FR]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 23 - line 24; figure 1 *; | [E]US5913487 (LEATHERMAN MICHAEL [US]) [E] 1* the whole document * |