EP0924231 - Aqueous polyurethane/urea dispersions containing alkoxysilane groups [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.03.2005 [2005/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER CORPORATION 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205-9741 / US | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states Bayer Corporation 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205-9741 / US | ||
For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roesler, Richard R. 863 Hillcrest Circle Wexford, PA 15090 / US | 02 /
Schmalstieg, Lutz Schnurgasse 45 50676 Köln / DE | 03 /
Gindin, Lyuba K. 788 Braffenton Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15228 / US | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | Pettrich, Klaus-Günter, et al c/o Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | Pettrich, Klaus-Günter, et al c/o Bayer AG, Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98123322.4 | 08.12.1998 | [1999/25] | Priority number, date | US19970992163 | 17.12.1997 Original published format: US 992163 | [1999/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0924231 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0924231 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/10, C08G18/12, C08G18/28, C09D175/04 | [1999/25] | CPC: |
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
C08G18/0823 (EP,US);
C08G18/289 (EP,US);
C09D175/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/289 (EP,US);
C09D175/04, C08L2666/58 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/09] |
Former [1999/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wässrige Polyurethan/Harnstoff-Dispersionen, die Alkoxysilangruppen beinhalten | [1999/25] | English: | Aqueous polyurethane/urea dispersions containing alkoxysilane groups | [1999/25] | French: | Dispersions aqueuses de polyuréthane/urée contenant des groupes alkoxysilanes | [1999/25] | Examination procedure | 23.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 04.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4582873 (GAA PETER C [US], et al) [A] 1,5,9 * column 3, line 34 - column 5, line 39 * * example 8; table 1 *; | [DA]US5364955 (ZWIENER CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [DA] 5 * column 1, line 61 - column 3, line 64 * * examples 1,6 *; | [DA]US5554686 (FRISCH JR KURT C [US], et al) [DA] 1,2,5-7,9 * column 23, line 46 - column 26, line 12 ** example 3 *; | [PX]EP0872499 (BAYER AG [DE]) [PX] 1,9 * page 2, line 40 - page 4, line 51 * * examples 1,4,6,7 * * claims 1,4,8 * |