EP0924894 - Method for generating pseudo-random data words to be used for encryption [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heeke, Helmut Anton-Meindl-Strasse 3E 81245 München / DE | [1999/25] | Application number, filing date | 98123376.0 | 08.12.1998 | [1999/25] | Priority number, date | DE1997157370 | 22.12.1997 Original published format: DE 19757370 | [1999/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0924894 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0924894 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/22, H04L9/26 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
H04L9/0662 (EP);
H04L2209/046 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/25] | H04L9/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [2001/48] |
Former [1999/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erzeugung pseudo-zufälliger Datenworte zur Verschlüsselung | [1999/25] | English: | Method for generating pseudo-random data words to be used for encryption | [1999/25] | French: | Procédé de génération de mots pseudoaléatoires pour le chiffrage | [1999/25] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/40] | 01.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/02] | 05.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4860353 (BROWN DAVID S) [X] 1-3,5-7,12 * figures 1-4 * * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 24 * * column 5, line 14 - column 6, line 30 * * Abstract *; | [A]US5432853 (YAMAMOTO SEIJI) [A] 1,7,10,12 * figures 2,5 * * column 3, line 19 - column 3, line 22 * * column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 8 * * column 8, line 37 - column 8, line 44 * * column 9, line 1 - column 9, line 17 *; | [A]US5079733 (QUISQUATER JEAN-JACQUES ET AL) [A] 1-6,8,12 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 64 * * column 5, line 22 - column 5, line 31 * * column 5, line 49 - column 5, line 56 * * column 6, line 6 - column 6, line 20 *; | [A]US4817145 (GUENTHER CHRISTOPH-GEORG) [A] 1,3-6,11,12 * figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 44 * |