EP0902565 - Optical communication system with optical amplification [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
Former [1999/11] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugaya, Yasushi, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Kinoshita, Susumu, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [1999/24] |
Former [1999/11] | 01 /
Sugaya, Yasushi, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8858 / JP | ||
02 /
Kinoshita, Susumu, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8858 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98123442.0 | 30.04.1997 | [1999/11] | Priority number, date | JP19960111447 | 02.05.1996 Original published format: JP 11144796 | [1999/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0902565 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0902565 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | [1999/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0902565 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04J14/02, H04B10/17, H04B10/18, H01S3/06 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
H01S3/06758 (EP,KR,US);
H04B10/296 (EP,KR,US);
H01S3/10015 (EP,KR,US);
H01S3/1003 (EP,KR,US);
H01S3/1301 (EP,KR,US);
H01S3/13013 (EP,US);
H04B10/291 (EP,US);
H04B10/2912 (EP,KR,US);
H04B10/2931 (EP,KR,US);
H04B10/2942 (EP,KR,US);
H04J14/0221 (EP,KR,US);
H01S2301/04 (EP,US);
H04B2210/003 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/11] | H04J14/02, H04B10/17 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/11] | Title | German: | Optisches Kommunikationssystem mit optischer Verstärkung | [1999/11] | English: | Optical communication system with optical amplification | [1999/11] | French: | Réseau optique de communication avec amplification optique | [1999/11] | Examination procedure | 10.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 15.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.12.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97107189.9 / EP0805571 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0637148 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [A] 1,5,7,11,15,17,21,25 * abstract * * column 1, line 22 - column 2, line 2 * * column 2, line 37 - line 55 *; | [A]GB2294170 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5,7,11,15,17,21,25 * abstract * * page 2, line 23 - line 35 * * page 4, line 21 - page 4A, line 2 * * page 16, line 9 - line 30 *; | [E]EP0812078 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [E] 1-28 * abstract * * column 2, line 37 - line 48 ** column 5, line 10 - line 59 *; | [A] - ZYSKIND J L ET AL, "FAST POWER TRANSIENTS IN OPTICALLY AMPLIFIED MULTIWAVELENGTH OPTICAL NETWORKS", OFC '96, OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION, TECHNICAL DIGEST SERIES, POSTCONFERENCE EDITION (IEEE CAT. NO.CH35901), SAN JOSE, CA, USA, (19960225), vol. 2, pages 451 - 454, XP002109064 [A] 1,5,7,11,15,17,21,25 * the whole document * |