EP1008337 - Medicament container closure with recessed integral spike access means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2005 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.03.2005 [2005/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRACCO International B.V. Strawinskylaan 3051 1077 ZX Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states Bracco International B.V. Strawinskylaan 3051 1077 ZX Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niedospial, John J. Jr. 22 Yearling Way Burlington, NJ 08016 / US | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr. NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI Srl, Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 98123562.5 | 10.12.1998 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1008337 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1008337 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/00, B65D51/22 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
B65D51/227 (EP,US);
A61J1/1406 (EP,US);
A61J1/2096 (EP,US);
B65D51/002 (EP,US);
A61J1/201 (EP,US);
B65D2251/0015 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/08] |
Former [2000/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verschluss für Artzneimittelbehälter mit versenktem Zugangsmittel für Einstechdorn | [2000/24] | English: | Medicament container closure with recessed integral spike access means | [2000/24] | French: | Fermeture de récipient pour médicaments avec moyens d'accès encastrés pour aiguille | [2000/24] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 15.12.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 02.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.01.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.01.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5817082 (NIEDOSPIAL JR JOHN J [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9403373 (WEST CO [US]) [Y] 1-20 * page 23, line 1 - page 24, line 12; figures 28,29 * | by applicant | US2289677 | US2326490 | US2342215 | US5332109 | US5364386 | US5429256 | US5433330 |