EP0926107 - Dielectric ceramic composition and ceramic electronic parts using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.2004 [2004/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugimoto, Yasutaka c/o Murata Manufacturing Co.Ltd 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | 02 /
Sunahara, Hirofumi c/o Murata Manufacturing Co.Ltd 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | 03 /
Sugou, Kimihide c/o Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | 04 /
Takagi, Hiroshi c/o Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | [1999/26] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | Laufhütte, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98123587.2 | 10.12.1998 | [1999/26] | Priority number, date | JP19970341491 | 11.12.1997 Original published format: JP 34149197 | JP19980313339 | 04.11.1998 Original published format: JP 31333998 | [1999/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0926107 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0926107 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | [1999/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0926107 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/46, C03C3/089, H01G4/12 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
C03C3/064 (EP,US);
C03C3/089 (EP,US);
C04B35/462 (EP,US);
C04B35/4686 (EP,US);
H01G4/12 (KR);
H01G4/1227 (EP,US);
H05K1/0306 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/33] |
Former [1999/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Dielektrische keramische Zusammensetzung und keramische elektronische Bauteile, die diese enthalten | [1999/26] | English: | Dielectric ceramic composition and ceramic electronic parts using the same | [1999/26] | French: | Composition céramique diélectrique et composants électroniques en céramique la contenant | [1999/26] | Examination procedure | 10.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/26] | 01.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0740310 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [Y] 1,8,12,15-18 * page 2, line 42 - page 3, line 20; claim 1; table 1 *; | [Y]EP0376670 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 1,8,12,15-18 * page 15, line 1 - page 17, line 2; claims 12-16; table 5 *; | [A]EP0504756 (TAIYO YUDEN KK [JP]) [A] 1-13,15-18 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0413321 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 14 * examples 1-6; tables 1-6 *; | [X]US4885661 (YOKOTANI YOICHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 14 * claims 1-6; table 1 *; | [X]JPH0786079 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 22, Database accession no. 1995-164968, XP002116614 & JPH0786079 A 19950331 (TAIYO YUDEN) [X] 14 * abstract * |