EP0926259 - Reactor for chemical vapour phase deposition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2002 [2002/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (A Delaware Corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto CA 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc., A Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303-0870 / US | ||
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states OTC Optical Technologies Center s.r.l. Via G. Reiss Romoli, 274 10148 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states CSELT Centro Studi e Laboratori Telecomunicazioni S.p.A. Via Guglielmo Reiss Romoli, 274 10148 Turin / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bertone, Daniele Via Bentivoglio, 5 10146 Torino / IT | [1999/26] | Representative(s) | Riederer Freiherr von Paar, Anton, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Kanzlei Landshut Postfach 26 64 84010 Landshut / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | Riederer Freiherr von Paar zu Schönau, Anton, et al Lederer, Keller & Riederer, Postfach 26 64 84010 Landshut / DE | Application number, filing date | 98124061.7 | 17.12.1998 | [1999/26] | Priority number, date | IT1997TO01126 | 23.12.1997 Original published format: IT TO971126 | [1999/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0926259 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0926259 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | [2001/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/44 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
C23C16/4588 (EP);
C23C16/481 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/03] |
Former [1999/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Reaktor für chemische Gasphasen-Abscheidung | [1999/26] | English: | Reactor for chemical vapour phase deposition | [1999/26] | French: | Réacteur de déposition chimique en phase vapeur | [1999/26] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/40] | 04.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.12.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.12.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4565157 (BRORS DANIEL L ET AL) [X] 1-28 * column 3, line 52 - column 5, line 43; figures 1A,1B *; | [X]US4920908 (BRORS DANIEL L ET AL) [X] 1-28 * column 3, line 52 - column 5, line 43; figures 1A,1B *; | [X]US3865072 (KIRKMAN EARL L) [X] 1-28 * column 3, line 4 - column 6, line 19; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US4615294 (PETERS JOHN W ET AL) [X] 1-28 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 19; figures 1,2 * * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 40 * * column 8, line 8 - column 9, line 3 *; | [X]US4501766 (SUZUKI KATSUMI ET AL) [X] 1-28 * column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 62; figures 4-6 * |