EP1014253 - Method of inputting a character using a restricted number of keys [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.01.2002 [2002/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hedberg, Anders Kämnärsvägen 7G:206 226 46 Lund / SE | 02 /
Ketwich, Johan van Föreningsgatan 43b 211 52 Malmö / SE | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Roerboel, Leif, et al Budde Schou A/S Hausergade 3 1128 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Roerboel, Leif, et al Budde, Schou & Ostenfeld A/S, Vester Sogade 10 1601 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 98124169.8 | 21.12.1998 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1014253 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/023 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
G06F3/0236 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, SE [2001/17] |
Former [2000/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | 28.12.2000 | LT | 28.12.2000 | LV | 28.12.2000 | MK | 28.12.2000 | RO | 28.12.2000 | SI | 28.12.2000 | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Eingabe eines Charakters mit einer begrenzten Anzahl von Tasten | [2000/26] | English: | Method of inputting a character using a restricted number of keys | [2000/26] | French: | Procédé d'entrée de caractères utilisant un nombre réduit de touches | [2000/26] | Examination procedure | 28.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 18.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2145257 (BARNES GUY DESMOND;SMITH CHARLES GEORGE) [X] 1-4,7 * page 3, line 8 - line 42; figures 6-9 *; | [X]US4385291 (PIGUET CHRISTIAN) [X] 1-4,7 * column A; figure 4 *; | [X]EP0313207 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO) [X] 1-4,7 * column 5, line 32 - column 6, line 2 * |