EP0906922 - Process for the polymerization of olefins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLVAY POLYOLEFINS EUROPE - BELGIUM (Société Anonyme) rue du Prince Albert, 44 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [1999/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Breulet, Jacques Madeliefjeslaan, 2 1970 Wezembeek-Oppem / BE | 02 /
Koch, Benoît rue de Lens-Saint-Servais, 8 4280 Hannut / BE | 03 /
Promel, Michel rue de Lombartzijde, 27 1120 Bruxelles / BE | 04 /
Bian, Jiang rue Vergote, 22 1200 Bruxelles / BE | 05 /
Lhost, Olivier Rue Grande, 94 7020 Maisieres / BE | [1999/26] |
Former [1999/14] | 01 /
Breulet, Jacques Madeliefjeslaan, 2 1970 Wezembeek-Oppem / BE | ||
02 /
Koch, Benoît rue de Lens-Saint-Servais, 8 4280 Hannut / BE | |||
03 /
Promel, Michel rue de Lombartzijde, 27 1120 Bruxelles / BE | |||
04 /
Bian, Jiang rue Vergote, 22 1200 Bruxelles / BE | |||
05 /
Lhost, Oliver rue Jules Cornet, 12/9 7000 Mons / BE | Representative(s) | Smith, Julian Philip Howard, et al BP International Limited Patents & Agreements Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | Smith, Julian Philip Howard, et al BP International Limited, Group Patents & Agreements, Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | ||
Former [1999/14] | Destryker, Elise Martine, et al Solvay Polyolefins Europe-Belgium (Société Anonyme) Département de la Propriété Industrielle 310, rue de Ransbeek 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 98124380.1 | 16.04.1996 | [1999/14] | Priority number, date | BE19950000397 | 28.04.1995 Original published format: BE 9500397 | [1999/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0906922 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0906922 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | [1999/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0906922 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/02, C08F297/08, C08F4/655, C08F4/22, C08F4/69 | [1999/20] | CPC data not yet available |
Former IPC [1999/14] | C08F10/02, C08F297/08, C08F4/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT, SE [1999/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Olefinpolymerisation | [1999/14] | English: | Process for the polymerization of olefins | [1999/14] | French: | Procédé de polymérisation d'oléfines | [1999/14] | Examination procedure | 19.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/03] | 05.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96201016.1 / EP0739909 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.01.2003 | PT | 08.04.2003 | SE | 08.04.2003 | ES | 30.07.2003 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/47] | AT | 08.01.2003 | |
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | PT | 08.04.2003 | |
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | SE | 08.04.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3082195 (PETERS EDWIN F, et al) [X] 1-8 * claim - *; | [X]EP0175532 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]) [X] 1-8 * page 5, line 28 - page 7, line 2 * * page 8, line 25 - page 9, line 3; claim - *; | [A]EP0273284 (NIPPON OIL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9309149 (CHEVRON RES & TECH [US]) [A] 1-8* page 17, line 31 - line 37; claim - *; | [X]EP0570051 (SOLVAY [BE]) [X] 1-8 * claim - *; | [A]EP0589472 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9426790 (SOLVAY [BE], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 21, line 26 - line 31 * * the whole document * |