EP0960970 - Ironing table with device for accessory on the underside of the ironing board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEIFHEIT Aktiengesellschaft Leifheitstrasse 56377 Nassau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | For all designated states LEIFHEIT Aktiengesellschaft Leifheitstrasse D-56377 Nassau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lämmler, Thomas Nelkenstrasse 11 74915 Waibstadt-Daisbach / DE | [1999/48] | Application number, filing date | 98124387.6 | 22.12.1998 | [1999/48] | Priority number, date | DE1998105246 | 10.02.1998 Original published format: DE 19805246 | [1999/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0960970 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0960970 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0960970 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D06F81/00 | [1999/48] | CPC: |
D06F81/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/41] |
Former [1999/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bügeltisch mit Zubehör-Träger auf Bügelbrett-Unterseite | [1999/48] | English: | Ironing table with device for accessory on the underside of the ironing board | [1999/48] | French: | Table de repassage avec dispositif pour accessoire sur la face inférieure de la planche de repassage | [1999/48] | Examination procedure | 07.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/23] | 03.08.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 03.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.09.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.02.2001 | 31.12.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   13.02.2003 | 31.12.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   06.03.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 22.12.2004 | [2006/13] | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2438054 (MAY HOLLIDAY MARGARET) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2,3,10; | [X]US2723097 (TYLER CLAUDE D) [X] 1,2 * figure - *; | [XA]US3268192 (MUNSON DONALD J) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 10; | [XA]US3603543 (BOTTOS HELEN P) [X] 1 * figure - * [A] 10; | [X]GB2072711 (GEMAC IND) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE8905609U (RUSCHITZKA F) [A] 1-3* figures 5-8 * |