EP0925979 - Vehicle drive system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. No.2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. No.2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuroda, Shojiro 24-1-625, Oonodai 4-chome Sagamihara city, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Abo, Keiju 41-30, Nakakibougaoka, Asahi-ku Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Takahara, Hideaki 4688-1, Soubudai 3-chome Zama city, Kanagawa / JP | [1999/26] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98124598.8 | 23.12.1998 | [1999/26] | Priority number, date | JP19970358611 | 25.12.1997 Original published format: JP 35861197 | [1999/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0925979 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0925979 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | [2000/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0925979 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/02 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
B60K6/36 (EP,US);
B60W20/30 (US);
B60K6/387 (EP);
B60K6/48 (EP);
B60K6/543 (EP);
B60W10/02 (EP);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60W10/10 (EP,US);
B60W20/00 (EP);
B60K5/04 (EP);
B60L2240/423 (EP);
B60L2240/486 (EP);
B60W2510/1015 (EP);
B60W2510/104 (EP);
B60W2540/10 (EP);
B60W2710/083 (EP);
F16H61/66 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2000/47] |
Former [1999/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Fahrzeugantrieb | [1999/26] | English: | Vehicle drive system | [1999/26] | French: | Transmission pour un véhicule automobile | [1999/26] | Examination procedure | 23.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/26] | 15.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4588040 (ALBRIGHT JR HAROLD D [US], et al)[A] 1; | [A]EP0788914 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 |