EP0925981 - Power transmitting system for a hybrid motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states FUJI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kashiwase, Hajime c/o Fuji Jukogyo K. K. 7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0023 / JP | [1999/26] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/26] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, Dr., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98124608.5 | 23.12.1998 | [1999/26] | Priority number, date | JP19970359909 | 26.12.1997 Original published format: JP 35990997 | JP19980004080 | 12.01.1998 Original published format: JP 408098 | JP19980006755 | 16.01.1998 Original published format: JP 675598 | JP19980006756 | 16.01.1998 Original published format: JP 675698 | JP19980022210 | 03.02.1998 Original published format: JP 2221098 | JP19980022211 | 03.02.1998 Original published format: JP 2221198 | [1999/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0925981 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0925981 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/04 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
B60K6/26 (EP,US);
B60W40/00 (US);
B60K6/365 (EP,US);
B60K6/40 (EP,US);
B60K6/445 (EP,US);
B60K6/46 (US);
B60K6/543 (EP,US);
B60W10/02 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60W10/10 (EP,US);
B60W10/115 (US);
B60W10/26 (EP,US);
B60W20/00 (EP);
B60K1/02 (EP,US);
B60W2510/244 (EP,US);
B60W2540/10 (EP,US);
B60W2540/12 (EP,US);
B60W2540/18 (EP);
F16H2037/088 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2005 (EP,US);
F16H3/724 (EP,US);
F16H9/18 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y10S903/903 (EP,US);
Y10S903/906 (EP,US);
Y10S903/91 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2001/19] |
Former [1999/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Leistungsübertragungssystem für Hybridfahrzeug | [1999/26] | English: | Power transmitting system for a hybrid motor vehicle | [1999/26] | French: | Système de transmission de puissance pour véhicule à moteur hybride | [1999/26] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/14] | 24.02.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 08.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.05.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2003/41] | 18.05.2003 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/41] | Divisional application(s) | EP03006756.5 / EP1321326 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.03.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB541105 (HEINRICH FRITZ LIEBRECHT) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US5577973 (SCHMIDT MICHAEL R [US]) [X] 2 * abstract *; | [X]EP0755818 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [X] 2* abstract *; | [Y]DE19639904 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 5,6 * abstract *; | [XY]DE19606771 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,4 * abstract * [Y] 5,6 | by applicant | JPH0946821 | JPH09100853 |