EP0939008 - Steering column switch for the coded signals which describe the switch positions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH Stuttgarter Strasse 119 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2000/48] |
Former [1999/35] | For all designated states ITT MANUFACTURING ENTERPRISES, INC. 1105 North Market Street, Suite 1217 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hecht, Walter Sudetenstr.86 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | 02 /
Simonis, Karl Oberdorfstr.9 74366 Kirchheim a.N. / DE | 03 /
Klein, Rudolf Trollingerweg 3 74348 Lauffen a. N. / DE | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1999/35] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 98124714.1 | 19.12.1998 | [1999/35] | Priority number, date | DE1998108547 | 28.02.1998 Original published format: DE 19808547 | [1999/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0939008 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0939008 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | [2003/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0939008 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/00, B60Q1/14 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
B60Q1/1476 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/35] | B60R16/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/05] |
Former [1999/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Lenkstockschalter für die Schaltstellung beschreibende codierte Schaltsignale | [1999/35] | English: | Steering column switch for the coded signals which describe the switch positions | [1999/35] | French: | Commutateur à levier pour les signaux codés décrivant les positions de commutation | [1999/35] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 08.11.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 17.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.12.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 20.02.2006 | [2006/50] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2552583 (JAEGER [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE4427883 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR1385949 (SEIMA) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]DE4332748 (MARQUARDT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * |