EP0839662 - INK JET CARTRIDGE, INK JET HEAD AND PRINTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/19] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Higuma, Masahiko Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ikeda, Masami Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Asai, Naohito Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Abe, Tsutomu Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Kashino, Toshio Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Karita, Seiichiro Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/19] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/19] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98200111.7 | 22.07.1993 | [1998/19] | Priority number, date | JP19920198474 | 24.07.1992 Original published format: JP 19847492 | JP19930122620 | 25.05.1993 Original published format: JP 12262093 | [1998/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0839662 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0839662 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | [1998/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0839662 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
B41J2/17556 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/17513 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/1752 (EP,US);
B41J2/17523 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/17546 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/17553 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/19] | Title | German: | Tintenstrahlpatrone, Tintenstrahlkopf und Drucker | [1998/29] | English: | INK JET CARTRIDGE, INK JET HEAD AND PRINTER | [1998/19] | French: | Cartouche à jet d'encre, tête à jet d'encre et imprimante | [1998/29] |
Former [1998/19] | TINTENSTRAHLPATRONE, TINTENKOPF UND DRUCHER | ||
Former [1998/19] | CARTOUCHE A JET D'ENCRE, TETE D'ENCRE ET IMPRIMANTE | Examination procedure | 18.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/02] | 09.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93305770.5 / EP0580433 | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40] | Request for further processing for: | 29.09.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 29.09.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.10.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.10.2002 | BE | 09.10.2002 | GR | 09.10.2002 | DK | 09.01.2003 | PT | 09.01.2003 | SE | 09.01.2003 | ES | 29.04.2003 | [2007/17] |
Former [2004/04] | AT | 09.10.2002 | |
BE | 09.10.2002 | ||
GR | 09.10.2002 | ||
PT | 09.01.2003 | ||
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/51] | AT | 09.10.2002 | |
BE | 09.10.2002 | ||
GR | 09.10.2002 | ||
PT | 09.01.2003 | ||
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 09.10.2002 | |
GR | 09.10.2002 | ||
PT | 09.01.2003 | ||
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 09.10.2002 | |
PT | 09.01.2003 | ||
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 09.01.2003 | |
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 09.01.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0419192 (CANON KK [JP])[A] 1,6,10,11,13,15-18; | [PA]US5182581 (KASHIMURA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [PA] 1-3,6,10,11,13-18; | [PA]EP0529625 (CANON KK [JP]) [PA] 1-3,6,8-10,13-18 | Examination | US4095237 | EP0488829 | EP0490579 |