EP0877257 - Electronic unit for measuring electric energy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2001 [2001/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TXT S.p.A. Via Socrate 41 20128 Milano / IT | [1998/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braga Illa, Alvise Via Vincenzo Monti 47 20123 Milano / IT | 02 /
Cicognani, Luca Via Savona 9 21052 Busto Arsizio (VA) / IT | 03 /
Crespi Reghizzi, Stefano Foro Bonaparte 48 20121 Milano / IT | 04 /
De Bellis, Antonio Corso Lodi 74 20139 Milano / IT | [1998/46] | Representative(s) | Giavarini, Francesco ABB Ricerca S.p.A. Viale Edison, 50 20099 Sesto San Giovanni (MI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/46] | Giavarini, Francesco ABB Ricerca S.p.A. Viale Edison, 50 20099 Sesto San Giovanni (MI) / IT | Application number, filing date | 98200163.8 | 22.01.1998 | [1998/46] | Priority number, date | IT1997MI00129 | 23.01.1997 Original published format: IT MI970129 | [1998/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0877257 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0877257 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | [1999/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01R22/00, G01R21/133 | [1999/52] | CPC: |
G01R21/133 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/47] | G01R22/00 | ||
Former IPC [1998/46] | G01R1/00 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/35] |
Former [1998/46] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektronischer Elektrizitätszähler | [1998/46] | English: | Electronic unit for measuring electric energy | [1998/46] | French: | Compteur d'électricité électronique | [1998/46] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/14] | 03.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.08.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.08.2000 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9533184 (ALDESTAM STEN ;WALDECK JOHAN (SE); ASTRA AB (SE); MARNFELDT GOERAN) [A] 1 * page 9, line 24 - page 10, line 26; figure 2 * * claims 1-10 *; | [A]US5548527 (HEMMINGER RODNEY C ET AL) [A] 1 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 13 * * column 12, line 56 - column 13, line 15 * * claims 10,16,17 * |