EP0861666 - Pharmaceutical composition for use in treatment of diabetes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | [2006/41] |
Former [1998/36] | For all designated states TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeda, Hitoshi 3-13-712, Nishiiwata 3-chome Higashiosaka, Osaka 578 / JP | 02 /
Sohda, Takashi 27-20, Higashikanmaki 2-chome Takatsuki, Osaka 569 / JP | 03 /
Odaka, Hiroyuki 12-12, Katsuragi 2-chome, Kita-ku Kobe, Hyogo 651-12 / JP | [1998/39] |
Former [1998/36] | 01 /
Ikeda, Hitoshi 3-13-712, Nishiiwata 3-chome Higashiosaka, Osaka 578 / JP | ||
02 /
Sohda, Takashi 27-20, Higashikanmaki 2-chome Takatsuki, Osaka 569 / JP | |||
03 /
Odaka, Hiroyuki 12-12, Katsuragi 2-chome, Kita-ku kode, Hyogo 651-12 / JP | Representative(s) | Dossmann, Gérard, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Dossmann, Gérard, et al Bureau D.A. Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/18] | Dossmann, Gérard, et al Bureau Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/41] | Wright, Robert Gordon McRae, et al Elkington & Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2001/45] | Hall, Marina, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2001/20] | Caffin, Lee, et al Takeda Euro Patent Office Takeda Europe Research & Development Centre Ltd. Savannah House 11-12 Charles II Street London SW1Y 4QU / GB | ||
Former [1998/36] | Hall, Marina Elkington and Fife Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 98200252.9 | 20.06.1996 | [1998/36] | Priority number, date | JP19950153500 | 20.06.1995 Original published format: JP 15350095 | [1998/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0861666 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0861666 | Date: | 10.02.1999 | [1999/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0861666 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4439, A61K31/155, A61P3/10 | [2003/25] | CPC: |
A61K9/2018 (EP,US);
A61K31/4427 (KR);
A61K31/135 (EP,US);
A61K31/19 (EP,US);
A61K31/415 (EP,US);
A61K31/42 (EP,US);
A61K31/4245 (EP,US);
A61K31/425 (EP,US);
A61K31/44 (EP,US);
A61K31/4439 (EP,US);
A61K31/445 (EP,US);
A61K31/50 (EP,US);
A61K31/52 (EP,US);
A61K31/535 (EP,US);
A61K31/64 (EP,US);
A61K31/70 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,US);
A61K9/4858 (EP,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4245, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/425, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/425, A61K31/135 (US,EP);
A61K31/425, A61K31/135, A61K31/44, A61K31/44 (EP,US);
A61K31/425, A61K31/155 (EP,US);
A61K31/425, A61K31/19 (EP,US);
A61K31/425, A61K31/22 (US,EP);
A61K31/425, A61K31/365 (US,EP);
A61K31/425, A61K31/40 (US,EP);
A61K31/425, A61K31/405 (US,EP);
A61K31/425, A61K31/425 (EP,US);
A61K31/4439, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/445, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/445, A61K31/425 (US,EP);
A61K31/44, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/44, A61K31/19 (US,EP);
A61K31/44, A61K31/21 (US,EP);
A61K31/44, A61K31/22 (US,EP);
A61K31/44, A61K31/365 (US,EP);
A61K31/44, A61K31/40 (US,EP);
A61K31/44, A61K31/405 (EP,US);
A61K31/52, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/52, A61K31/44 (US,EP);
A61K31/64, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/64, A61K31/425 (US,EP);
A61K31/70, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [1998/36] | A61K45/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/36] | Title | German: | Pharmazeutische Zubereitung zur Verwendung in der Behandlung von Diabetes | [1998/36] | English: | Pharmaceutical composition for use in treatment of diabetes | [1998/36] | French: | Composition pharmaceutique pour utilisation dans le traitement du diabète | [1998/36] | Examination procedure | 11.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/36] | 13.02.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.1999 | Observations by third parties | 12.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96304570.3 / EP0749751 | Divisional application(s) | EP01203170.4 / EP1174135 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.09.2004
29.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. 5 Basel Street 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL Opponent's representative Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al, et al Bird & Bird LLP Van Alkemadelaan 700 2597 AW Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.09.2004
29.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. 5 Basel Street 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL Opponent's representative Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al, et al Bird & Bird LLP Van Alkemadelaan 700 2597 AW Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2004/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.09.2004
TEVA Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. 5 Basel Street 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL Opponent's representative Tauchner, Paul, Dr., et al, et al Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | 26.10.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.02.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.06.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.07.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.11.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.11.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.05.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ] | 07.05.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2012/44] | 07.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 27.01.2010 | Appeal received No. T0184/10 | 06.04.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.05.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 30.08.2006 | Appeal received No. T1357/06 | 13.11.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.09.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 16.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.09.2008 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | 07.05.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.05.2012 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 17.12.2003 | LI | 17.12.2003 | [2013/07] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9303724 (UPJOHN CO [US]) [X] 15-29 * claims 1-4 *; | [Y] - WHITCOMB ET AL, "THIAZOLIDINEDIONES", EXPERT OPIN. INVEST. DRUGS, BRITAIN, (1995), vol. 4, no. 12, pages 1299 - 1309, XP000600699 [Y] 1-10,15-29 * page 1304, column L, paragraph 1 - page 1305, column L, paragraph 1 * | [Y] - JAMES E.F. REYNOLDS, MARTINDALE THE EXTRA PHARMACOPOEIA THIRTIETH EDITION, LONDON, THE PHARMACEUTICAL PRESS, (1993), XP002088152 [Y] 1-10,15-29 * pages 276-290 * | [PX] - FOOT E A ET AL, "Improved metabolic control by addition of troglitazone to glibenclamide therapy in non-insulin-dependent diabetics.", 31ST ANNUAL MEETING OF THE EUROPEAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE STUDY OF DIABETES, STOCKHOLM, SWEDEN, SEPTEMBER 12-16, 1995. DIABETOLOGIA 38 (SUPPL. 1). 1995. A44. ISSN: 0012-186X, XP002088151 [PX] 15-29 * abstract * | other | - NAKANO K. ET AL, "Clinical Evaluation of a new Oral Hypoglycemic Drug, CS-045, on Daily Profile of Blood Glucose in Patients with Non-Insulin Dependent Diabetes Mellitus", J.CLINICAL THERAPEUTICS & MEDICINES, (199307), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 151 - 164, XP000847575 | - ISHIDA T. ET AL, "Oral Hypoglycemic Agents-New Oral Drugs and New Strategy of Treatment", CLINIC ALL-ROUND, (199411), vol. 43, no. 11, pages 2615 - 2621, XP000847576 |