EP0863388 - "Device for the characterisation of laser beams". [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CESI Centro Elettrotecnico Sperimentale Italiano Giacinto Motta S.P.A. Via Rubattino, 54 20134 Milano / IT | For all designated states Laser Point s.r.l. Via Galilei, 1 20090 Segrate / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/25] | For all designated states CESI Centro Elettrotecnico Sperimentale Italiano Giacinto Motta S.P.A. Via Rubattino, 54 20134 Milano / IT | ||
For all designated states Laser Point s.r.l. Via Galilei, 1 20090 Segrate / IT | |||
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states ENEL S.p.A. 3 Via G.B. Martini I-00198 Roma / IT | ||
For all designated states Laser Point s.r.l. Via Galilei, 1 20090 Segrate / IT | |||
Former [1998/37] | For all designated states CISE S.p.A. Via Carducci, 14 I-20123 Milan / IT | ||
For all designated states Laser Point s.r.l. Via Galilei, 1 20090 Segrate / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stucchi, Emanuele Via Don Bosco, 7 24126 Bergamo / IT | [1998/37] | Representative(s) | Mittler, Enrico Mittler & C. S.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | Mittler, Enrico c/o Mittler & C. s.r.l., Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 98200660.3 | 04.03.1998 | [1998/37] | Priority number, date | IT1997MI00504 | 07.03.1997 Original published format: IT MI970504 | [1998/37] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0863388 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01J1/42 | [1998/37] | CPC: |
G01J1/4257 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/21] |
Former [1998/37] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Charakterisierung von Laserstrahlen | [1998/37] | English: | "Device for the characterisation of laser beams". | [1998/37] | French: | Dispositif pour la caractérisation des faisceaux laser | [1998/37] | Examination procedure | 13.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 10.03.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 01.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/16] | 06.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.04.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5459565 (AHARON OREN [IL]) [X] 1,8 * column 3, line 52 - line 55 * * column 6, line 28 - line 40 * * column 6, line 44 - column 7, line 30 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]US3612885 (ARNAUD JACQUES A) [A] 1-6,9 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * column 2, line 44 - line 73 * * column 3, paragraph 4 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5078491 (JOHNSTON JR THOMAS F [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 6, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 8 * * column 7, line 57 - column 8, line 29 * * figures 7,8 *; | [A]JPS6224117 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870630), vol. 011, no. 201, Database accession no. (P - 590), & JP62024117 A 19870202 (NEC CORP) [A] 2 * abstract * |