EP0941948 - Assembly for collecting and compressing waste and method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2002 [2002/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Budev B.V. Dommelstraat 1A 5271 AT St. Michielsgestel / NL | [1999/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paping, Max Gregor Dommelstraat 1a 5271 AT St. Michielgestel / NL | [1999/37] | Representative(s) | Schumann, Bernard Herman Johan Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | Schumann, Bernard Herman Johan Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 98200724.7 | 09.03.1998 | [1999/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0941948 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65F1/14, B30B9/30 | [1999/37] | CPC: |
B30B9/301 (EP);
B30B9/306 (EP);
B30B9/3085 (EP);
B30B9/3096 (EP);
B65F1/1405 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/37] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Sammeln und Pressen von Abfällen | [1999/37] | English: | Assembly for collecting and compressing waste and method therefor | [1999/37] | French: | Ensemble pour la collecte et la compression de déchets et procédé de mise en oeuvre | [1999/37] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/19] | 01.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/16] | 09.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.2000 | 31.03.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US4519308 (K. EBERLE) [X] 1,2,5,6,9,13-15 * column 2, line 24 - column 4, line 16 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 7,8,10 [Y] 3,4; | [YA]FR2120535 (O. AKERBERG) [Y] 3,4 * page 2, line 29 - page 5, line 15 * * figures 1-5 * [A] 1,2,5,6,14,15; | [YA]US5001977 (T. TRACY) [Y] 4 * column W * [A] 1-3,5,6,12,14,15; | [X]DE2030913 (DEMAG AG) [X] 1,2,5,14,15 * page 3, line 12 - line 28 * * figure . *; | [X]DE7713935U (W. CORDES) [X] 1,2,14,15 * page 9, line 20 - page 11, line 5 * * figure 4 * |