EP0853960 - Collapsible play structures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 28.03.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patent Category Corporation 1823 Enterprise Way Monrovia, CA 91016-2888 / US | [1998/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zheng, Yu 1065 Howard Avenue Covina, California 91722 / US | [1998/30] | Representative(s) | Wallinger, Michael Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Wallinger, Michael Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/02] | Wallinger, Michael, Dr.-Ing. Wallinger & Partner, Patentanwälte, Zweibrückenstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/21] | Baker, Colin John, et al Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [1998/30] | MacGregor, Gordon, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98200861.7 | 26.07.1995 | [1998/30] | Priority number, date | US19940281369 | 27.07.1994 Original published format: US 281369 | [1998/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0853960 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0853960 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0853960 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A63B9/00 | [1998/30] | CPC: |
E04H15/14 (EP,US);
A63B9/00 (EP,US);
E04H15/006 (EP,US);
E04H15/40 (EP,US);
E04H15/56 (EP,US);
E04H15/58 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/30] | Title | German: | Zusammenfaltbare Spielstruktur | [1998/30] | English: | Collapsible play structures | [1998/30] | French: | Structure à jouer repliable | [1998/30] | Examination procedure | 09.04.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 14.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/42] | 23.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.10.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 21.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95305212.3 / EP0694318 | Divisional application(s) | EP98203965.3 / EP0914841 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.02.2000
01.07.2000
ADMISSIBLE Bertram, Rainer Maximilianstr. 58 80538 München / DE Opponent's representative Hilgers, Hans Hubert Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | 02
15.06.2000
12.07.2000
ADMISSIBLE Finecard International Limited Topaz House, Oldgate, St. Michaels Industrial Estate Widnes Cheshire, WA8 8TL / GB Opponent's representative Ajello, Michael John, et al, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Greg's Building 1 Booth Street Manchester M2 4DU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.02.2000
01.07.2000
ADMISSIBLE Bertram Rainer Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE Opponent's representative Hilgers, Hans Hubert Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
02
15.06.2000
12.07.2000
ADMISSIBLE Finecard International Limited Topaz House, Oldgate, St. Michaels Industrial Estate Widnes Cheshire, WA8 8TL / GB Opponent's representative Ajello, Michael John, et al, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Greg's Building 1 Booth Street Manchester M2 4DU / GB | |||
Former [2000/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.02.2000
01.07.2000
ADMISSIBLE Bertram Rainer Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE Opponent's representative Hilgers, Hans Hubert Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
02
15.06.2000
Finecard International Limited Topaz House, Oldgate, St. Michaels Industrial Estate Widnes Cheshire, WA8 8TL / GB Opponent's representative Ajello, Michael John, et al, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Greg's Buildings 1 Booth Street Manchester, M2 4DU / GB | |||
Former [2000/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.02.2000
01.07.2000
ADMISSIBLE Bertram Rainer Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE Opponent's representative Hilgers, Hans Hubert Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | 17.07.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.09.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.04.2002 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.04.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.07.2002 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.07.2002 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 12.03.2003 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 26.08.2002 | Appeal received No. T0974/02 | 06.11.2002 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5301705 (ZHENG YU [US]) [DA] 1,8; | [A]DE4114916 (FRANKEL ARIE [US]); | [A]DE2015649 (R LOEFFLER) | Opposition | GB2263920 | WO9102870 | EP0487642 | - Advertising brochure of Play-Hut Firm |