EP0872959 - Low noise frequency divider [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.12.2004 [2004/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Canard, David Société Civile S.P.I.D., 156 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | 02 /
Fillatre, Vincent Société Civile S.P.I.D., 156 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [1998/43] | Representative(s) | Charpail, François, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | Charpail, François, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1998/43] | Caron, Jean Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98201149.6 | 09.04.1998 | [1998/43] | Priority number, date | FR19970004598 | 15.04.1997 Original published format: FR 9704598 | [1998/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0872959 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0872959 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H03K23/54, H03J5/02 | [1998/43] | CPC: |
H03J5/0272 (EP,KR,US);
H03K23/542 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/26] |
Former [1998/43] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Rauscharmer Frequenzteiler | [1998/43] | English: | Low noise frequency divider | [1998/43] | French: | Diviseur de fréquence à faible bruit. | [1998/43] | Examination procedure | 21.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/24] | 20.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS5484471 ; | [X]JPH07321642 ; | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19790908), vol. 3, no. 107, Database accession no. (E - 136), & JP54084471 A 19790507 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2,3 | [Y] - MOLLER K -D, "PLL-SYNTHESIZERSCHALTKREIS U 1056 D", RADIO FERNSEHEN ELEKTRONIK, (19900101), vol. 39, no. 4, pages 230, 261 - 263, XP000127902 [Y] 2,3,3,2 * figures 7,8 * * figure 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 096, no. 004, & JP07321642 A 19951208 (NEC CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * |