EP0875515 - Sulfatation of estrogen mixtures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/45] | "Sulfatation of estrogen mixtures" | ||
[1998/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [1998/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raijmakers, Petrus Hendricus Erphoevenweg 5 5406 VD Uden / NL | 02 /
Hofstraat, Robert Gerrit Litherweg 40 5346 JA Oss / NL | 03 /
Boom van den, Henricus Petrus Antonius Johannes M. Rudigerstraat 29 5408 AA Volkel / NL | [1998/49] |
Former [1998/45] | 01 /
Raijmakers, P. H. Erphoevenweg 5 5406 VD Uden / NL | ||
02 /
Hofstraat, R. G. Litherweg 40 5346 JA Oss / NL | |||
03 /
Boom van den, H. P. A. J. M. Rudigerstraat 29 5408 AA Volkel / NL | Representative(s) | Kraak, Hajo, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Ltd. Patent Docket Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire, EN11 9BU / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | Kraak, Hajo, et al N.V. Organon, Postbus 20 5340 BH Oss / NL | Application number, filing date | 98201385.6 | 28.04.1998 | [1998/45] | Priority number, date | EP19970201333 | 02.05.1997 Original published format: EP 97201333 | [1998/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0875515 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0875515 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | [1998/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0875515 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07J31/00, A61K31/565 | [1998/45] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/31] |
Former [1998/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sulfatierung von Östrogen-Mischungen | [1998/45] | English: | Sulfatation of estrogen mixtures | [1998/49] | French: | Sulphation des mélanges d'estrogènes | [1998/45] |
Former [1998/45] | "Sulfatation of estrogen mixtures" | Examination procedure | 25.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/29] | 17.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB697531 (S B PENICK & COMPANY) [X] 1-5 * examples VII,IX,X * [Y] 1-8; | [Y]US5210081 (RAVEENDRANATH PANOLIL C [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5395831 (GEMMILL JR FREDERICK O [US], et al) [Y] 6 * column 5 *; | [Y]WO9510528 (SCHERING AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * examples 1-3,5 *; | [PY]EP0771816 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL]) [PY] 7,8* the whole document *; | [Y] - JACQUESY J -C ET AL, "CHIMIE ORGANIQUE - REACTIONS EN MILIEUX HYPERACIDES. ISOMERISATION SELECTIVE DE L'EQUILINE EN MILIEU ACIDE OU HYPERACIDE", COMPTES RENDUS HEBDOMADAIRES DES SEANCES DE L'ACADEMIE DES SCIENCES, SERIE C: SCIENCES CHIMIQUES, (197203), vol. 274, no. 10, pages 969 - 971, XP000612086 [Y] 6 * the whole document * | [A] - AYANOGLU E ET AL, "USE OF N-LITHIOETHYLENEDIAMINE IN THE DOUBLE BOND ISOMERIZATION AND DEGRADATION OF STEROL SIDE CHAINS", TETRAHEDRON, (1979), vol. 35, no. 13, pages 1591 - 1594, XP000612084 [A] 7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4020(79)80020-4 | [Y] - R. W. ROOS, "Determination of Conjugated and Esterified Estrogens in Pharmaceutical Tablet Dosage Forms by High-Pressure, Normal Phase Partition Chromatography", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHIC SCIENCE, (197611), vol. 14, no. 11, pages 505 - 512, XP002041740 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document * | [Y] - K. M. MCERLANE ET AL, "GLC Assay of Conjugated Estrogen Formulations", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES., WASHINGTON US, (197704), vol. 66, no. 4, pages 523 - 526, XP002041741 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660415 | [DY] - "FDA panel - no decision on oestrogens", SCRIP, (19950808), no. 2049, page 15, XP002041742 [DY] 1-6 * the whole document * |