EP0874491 - Deinterleaving circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/44] | Signal processing apparatus and method | ||
[1998/46] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DISCOVISION ASSOCIATES 2355 Main Street, Suite 200 Irvine, CA 92614 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/44] | For all designated states Discovision Associates 2355 Main Street, Suite 200 Irvine, CA 92614 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Claydon, Anthony Peter John 14 Sydney Buildings Bath, Avon BA2 6BZ / GB | 02 /
MacFarlane, Charles D. 8 Woodland Avenue Dursley, Gloucestershire GL11 4EW / GB | 03 /
Gammack, Richard John 22 Gloucester St., St. James Bristol, Avon BS2 8PN / GB | 04 /
Jones, Anthony M. 31 Templar Road Yate, Bristol, Avon BS17 5TF / GB | 05 /
Robbins, Williams P. 19 Springhill Cam, Gloucestershire GL11 5PE / GB | 06 /
Barnes, Mark Michael 16 The Close, Kingston St. Michael Chippenham, Wiltshire / GB | [1998/44] | Representative(s) | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/44] | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras B.P. 32 20, rue Louis Chirpaz 69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 98202126.3 | 19.03.1996 | [1998/44] | Priority number, date | GB19950011568 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: GB 9511568 | [1998/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0874491 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H03M13/22 | [1998/44] | CPC: |
H04L1/0057 (EP,US);
H04L1/00 (KR);
H03K5/24 (EP,US);
H03M13/15 (EP,US);
H03M13/151 (EP,US);
H03M13/2707 (EP,US);
H03M13/2764 (EP,US);
H04L1/0045 (EP,US);
H04L1/0071 (EP,US);
H04L25/03038 (EP,US);
H04L25/03866 (EP,US);
H04L25/062 (EP,US);
H04L27/02 (EP,US);
H04L27/2273 (EP,US);
H04L27/3809 (EP,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,US);
H04N5/211 (EP,US);
H04N5/4446 (EP,US);
H04N5/455 (EP,US);
H04N5/52 (EP,US);
H04L2027/0032 (EP,US);
H04L2027/0061 (EP,US);
H04L2027/0067 (EP,US);
H04L2027/0073 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1998/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Entschachtelungsschaltung | [1998/46] | English: | Deinterleaving circuit | [1998/46] | French: | Circuit de désentrelacement | [1998/46] |
Former [1998/44] | Signalverarbeitungsgerät und Verfahren | ||
Former [1998/44] | Signal processing apparatus and method | ||
Former [1998/44] | Appareil et méthode de traitement de signal | Examination procedure | 25.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/44] | 01.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/41] | 21.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/41] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96301869.2 / EP0748124 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |