EP0889669 - Communication system with special channel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2006/08] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2003/20] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2002/40] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2000/02] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1999/09] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1999/01] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duque-Anton, Jesus-Manuel, Dr. c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH. Röntgenstrasse 24, 22335 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Günther, Ralf c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH. Röntgenstrasse 24, 22335 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
Meuser, Thomas, Dr. c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH. Röntgenstrasse 24, 22335 Hamburg / DE | 04 /
Wasel, Josef, Dr. c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH. Röntgenstrasse 24, 22335 Hamburg / DE | 05 /
Karabek, Raschid c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH. Röntgenstrasse 24, 22335 Hamburg / DE | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Volmer, Georg, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 98202146.1 | 26.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | DE1997128505 | 03.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19728505 | [1999/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0889669 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0889669 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | [2000/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0889669 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US);
H04L12/28 (KR);
H04L2012/5614 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5626 (EP,US);
H04L2012/563 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/49] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kommunikationssystem mit Sonderkanal | [1999/01] | English: | Communication system with special channel | [1999/01] | French: | Système de communication avec un canal spécial | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 01.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 22.02.2006 | [2008/12] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9525411 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,5 * abstract * * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 7; figure 1 * * page 5, line 20 - line 32 * * page 7, line 6 - page 9, line 33; figures 2,3 * * page 11, line 21 - line 28 * * page 13, line 21 - page 15, line 10; figure 6 *; | [A]GB2308040 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [A] 1,5 * abstract * * page 6, line 6 - page 7, line 5 *; | [A]EP0449095 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5 * abstract * * column 6, line 6 - column 9, line 3 * |