EP0968931 - A flexible package with easy-opening peel seal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2002 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2002 [2002/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crozet, Yvon Bld du Jubile 141 1080 Brussels / BE | 02 /
Rogers, Neil John Lenteklokjeslaan 1 1020 Brussels / BE | [2000/01] | Representative(s) | Engisch, Gautier, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA IP Patent Department Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | Engisch, Gautier, et al BVBA Procter & Gamble Europe SPRL, Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 98202229.5 | 02.07.1998 | [2000/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0968931 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/60, B65D75/46, B65D75/50 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
B65B9/02 (EP);
B65B9/06 (EP);
B65D75/46 (EP);
B65D75/50 (EP);
B65D75/5855 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/37] |
Former [2000/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Flexibler Behälter mit einfach zerreissbarer Siegelnaht | [2000/01] | English: | A flexible package with easy-opening peel seal | [2000/01] | French: | Récipient flexible avec scellement facilement ouvrable par pelage | [2000/01] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 01.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/39] | 12.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9113005 (TEICH AG [AT]) [X] 1-5,8,9 * abstract * [A] ; | [A]US3734388 (HOPKINS A) [A] 1-4,6,7,9 * abstract * | by applicant | WO9702993 |