EP0893260 - Ink jet printing apparatus and method accommodating printing mode control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1999/04] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wen, Xin Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1999/04] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2002/16] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited (W92) Patents Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [1999/04] | Lewandowsky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Kodak Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 98202342.6 | 13.07.1998 | [1999/04] | Priority number, date | US19970899616 | 24.07.1997 Original published format: US 899616 | [1999/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0893260 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0893260 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/045, B41J2/05 | [1999/04] | CPC: |
B41J2/04551 (EP,US);
B41J2/04 (EP,US);
B41J2/0458 (EP,US);
B41J2/04588 (EP,US);
B41J2/0459 (EP,US);
B41J2/04591 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/34] |
Former [1999/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Tintenstrahldrucken mit Druckmodussteuerung | [1999/04] | English: | Ink jet printing apparatus and method accommodating printing mode control | [1999/04] | French: | Appareil et procédé d'impression à jet d'encre permettant de commander le mode d'impression | [1999/04] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 10.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/31] | 27.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO9808687 (TOPAZ TECH INC [US]) [PX] 1,9 * page 25, line 7 - page 26, line 12; figure 14; claim - *; | [A]US4521786 (BAIN LEE L [US]) [A] 1,2,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0670224 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,4,9,12 * the whole document *; | [A]US4617580 (MIYAKAWA AKIRA [JP]) [A] 4,12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0750988 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,9 * abstract * * column 7, line 52 - column 17, line 49 *; | [A]EP0636477 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) [A] 1,9 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4748453 | US5621524 |