EP0905316 - Antistatic layer for photographic paper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Majumdar, Debasis, Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Grashof, Hans Reynolds, Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Kress, Robert John, Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1999/13] | Parent, Yves, et al KODAK INDUSTRIE, Département Brevets, CRT - Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 98203129.6 | 17.09.1998 | [1999/13] | Priority number, date | US19970939515 | 29.09.1997 Original published format: US 939515 | [1999/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0905316 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D21H19/82, G03C1/85, D21H19/40 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
G03C1/85 (EP,US);
G03C1/79 (EP,US);
G03C1/853 (EP,US);
G03C1/89 (EP,US);
G03C2200/36 (EP,US);
Y10T428/253 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/50] |
Former [1999/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Antistatische Schicht für ein photographisches Papier | [1999/13] | English: | Antistatic layer for photographic paper | [1999/13] | French: | Couche antistatique pour un papier photographique | [1999/13] | Examination procedure | 03.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/44] | 19.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/32] | 04.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6135441 ; | [A]JPS60239747 ; | [A]JPH07234476 ; | [A]GB1456885 (WIGGINS TEAPE LTD) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 84 - line 90 * * page 2, line 49 - line 75 *; | [DA]US4173480 (WOODWARD ANTONY I [GB]) [DA] 1-10 * examples V-VIII *; | [A]US5104779 (SAEVERIN ECKEHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 5, line 8 - line 9; claims 1-9 *; | [DA]EP0558138 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [DA] 1-10 * example 1; claims 1-6 *; | [A]EP0644454 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [A] 1-10 * page 5, line 48 - line 50 ** page 7, line 7 - line 21 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 86, no. 14, Database accession no. 86-090350, XP002088991 & JPS6135441 A 19860219 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 86, no. 03, Database accession no. 86-017140, XP002088992 & JPS60239747 A 19851128 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 44, Database accession no. 95-341187, XP002088993 & JPH07234476 A 19950905 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |