EP0896879 - Simplified ink jet head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.2003 [2003/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPECTRA, INC. P.O. Box 68C Etna Road Hanover, NH 03755 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/07] | For all designated states SPECTRA, INC. P.O. Box 68-C Hanover, NH 03755 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moynihan, Edward R. RFD No.2, Box 59 West Lebanon, NH 03784 / US | 02 /
Palifka, Robert G. Archertown Road, Box 242 Orford, NH 03777 / US | 03 /
Hine, Nathan P. HCR 65, Box 47 South Strafford, VT 05070 / US | 04 /
Biggs, Melvin L. PO Box 206 Norwich, VT 05055 / US | 05 /
Barss, Steven H. HCR 64, Box 476 Wilmot Flat, NH 03287 / US | 06 /
Paulson, Bruce A. 31 Unity Road Newport, NH 03773 / US | 07 /
Gailus, David W. 9 Church Street Merrimack, NH 03054 / US | 08 /
Hoisington, Paul A. 57 Renihan Meadow Lebanon, NH 03766 / US | 09 /
Adams-Brady, David Bonner Road, PO Box 183 Meriden, NH 03770 / US | 10 /
McDonald, Marlene M. Shaker Boulevard, Box 110A Enfield, NH 03748 / US | 11 /
Mackay, Diane RR1, Box 55 Corinth, VT 05039 / US | 12 /
Mackay, Stephen C. RR1, Box 55 Corinth, VT 05039 / US | [1999/24] |
Former [1999/20] | 01 /
Moynihan, Edward R. RFD N 2, Box 59 Lebanon, NH 03766 / US | ||
02 /
Palifka, Robert G. Archertown Road, Box 242 Orford, NH 03777 / US | |||
03 /
Hine, Nathan P. HCR 65, Box 47 South Strafford, VT 05070 / US | |||
04 /
Biggs, Melvin L. PO Box 206 Norwich, VT 05055 / US | |||
05 /
Barss, Steven H. HCR 64, Box 476 Wilmot Flat, NH 03287 / US | |||
06 /
Paulson, Bruce A. 31 Unity Road Newport, NH 03773 / US | |||
07 /
Gailus, David W. 9 Church Street Merrimack, NH 03054 / US | |||
08 /
Hoisington, Paul A. 57 Renihan Meadow Lebanon, NH 03766 / US | |||
09 /
Adams-Brady, David Bonner Road, PO Box 183 Meriden, NH 03770 / US | |||
10 /
McDonald, Marlene M. Shaker Boulevard, Box 110A Enfield, NH 03748 / US | |||
11 /
Mackay, Diane RR1, Box 55 Corinth, VT 05039 / US | |||
12 /
Mackay, Stephen C. RR1, Box 55 Corinth, VT 05039 / US | |||
Former [1999/07] | 01 /
Moynihan, Edward R. RFD N 2, Box 59 Lebanon, NH 03766 / US | ||
02 /
Palifka, Robert G. Archertown Road, Box 242 Orford, NH 03777 / US | |||
03 /
Hine, Nathan P. HCR 65, Box 47 South Strafford, VT 05070 / US | |||
04 /
Biggs, Melvin L. PO Box 206 Norwich, VT 05055 / US | |||
05 /
Barss, Steven H. HCR 64, Box 476 Wilmot Flat, NH 03287 / US | |||
06 /
Paulson, Bruce A. 31 Unity Road Newport, NH 03773 / US | |||
07 /
Gailus, David W. 9 Church Street Merrimack, NH 03054 / US | |||
08 /
Hoisington, Paul A. RFD, Box 145A Thetford Center, VT 05075 / US | |||
09 /
Adams-Brady, David Bonner Road, PO Box 183 Meriden, NH 03770 / US | |||
10 /
McDonald, Marlene M. Shaker Boulevard, Box 110A Enfield, NH 03748 / US | |||
11 /
Mackay, Diane RR1, Box 55 Corinth, VT 05039 / US | |||
12 /
Mackay, Stephen C. RR1, Box 55 Corinth, VT 05039 / US | Representative(s) | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/07] | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98203766.5 | 17.03.1995 | [1999/07] | Priority number, date | US19940215301 | 21.03.1994 Original published format: US 215301 | [1999/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0896879 | Date: | 17.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0896879 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | [1999/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0896879 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/45, B41J2/14, B41J2/19, H01L41/08 | [1999/25] | CPC: |
B41J2/1614 (EP,US);
B41J2/14 (KR);
B41J2/14201 (EP,US);
B41J2/14282 (EP,US);
B41J2/155 (EP,US);
B41J2/162 (EP,US);
B41J2/1623 (EP,US);
B41J2/1626 (EP,US);
B41J2/1631 (EP,US);
B41J2/1632 (EP,US);
B41J2/1634 (EP,US);
B41J2/1642 (EP,US);
B41J2/17563 (EP,US);
B41J2/19 (EP,US);
H10N30/045 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14362 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14379 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14387 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1999/07] | B41J2/14, B41J2/045 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/07] | Title | German: | Vereinfachter Tintenstrahldruckkopf | [1999/07] | English: | Simplified ink jet head | [1999/07] | French: | Tête à jet d'encre simplifiée | [1999/07] | Examination procedure | 09.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/07] | 12.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95914098.9 / EP0699137 | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4571599 (REZANKA IVAN [US]); | [XY]US4995940 (HINE NATHAN P [US], et al) | by applicant | US4584590 | US4835554 | US4937598 | US5087930 | US5265315 | WO9525637 |