EP0920195 - Device for the acquisition and amplification of electronic signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Darthenay, Frédéric Société Civile S.P.I.D., 156, Bld. Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | 02 /
Jacquet, Sébastien Société Civile S.P.I.D., 156, Bld. Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | 03 /
Morisson, Richard Société Civile S.P.I.D., 156, Bld. Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [1999/22] | Representative(s) | Charpail, François, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | Charpail, François, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1999/22] | Caron, Jean Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98203909.1 | 18.11.1998 | [1999/22] | Priority number, date | FR19970015030 | 28.11.1997 Original published format: FR 9715030 | [1999/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0920195 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/18, H04N5/20 | [1999/22] | CPC: |
H04N5/18 (EP,KR);
H04N5/20 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/07] |
Former [1999/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Gewinnen und Verstärken von elektronischen Signalen | [1999/22] | English: | Device for the acquisition and amplification of electronic signals | [1999/22] | French: | Dispositif d'acquisition et d'amplification de signaux électroniques | [1999/22] | Examination procedure | 02.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 25.02.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3970777 (BRADFORD ROBERT S, et al); | [A]US4410876 (SAWAGATA KIYOSHI [JP]); | [X]EP0255274 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]US4831378 (BAARS NICOLAAS J [FR], et al); | [A]EP0462804 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]); | [A]US5121117 (RABII KHOSRO M [US]); | [Y]US5153929 (ITAGAKI HIROSHI [JP]); | [A]US5157493 (HAMON JOEL [FR], et al); | [A]US5371552 (BRUMMETTE STEVEN C [US], et al); | [A]US5410366 (HOSTETLER DAVID A [US]); | [Y]US5519441 (GUSMANO DONALD J [US], et al); | [A]EP0714169 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [FR]) |