EP0919652 - Method for manufacturing a pile fabric with coarse pile warp threads [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.12.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Michel Van de Wiele Michel Van de Wielestraat 7/17 B-8510 Kortrijk (Marke) / BE | [1999/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Debaes, Johnny Diepestraat 5 8890 Moorslede / BE | [1999/22] | Representative(s) | Leherte, Georges M.L.M. K.O.B. N.V. Pres. Kennedypark 31c 8500 Kortrijk / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | Leherte, Georges M.L.M., Dr. K.O.B. n.v., Pres. Kennedypark 31c 8500 Kortrijk / BE | Application number, filing date | 98204003.2 | 30.11.1998 | [1999/22] | Priority number, date | BE19970000970 | 01.12.1997 Original published format: BE 9700970 | [1999/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0919652 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0919652 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | [1999/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0919652 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D03D27/10 | [1999/22] | CPC: |
D03D27/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/27] |
Former [1999/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Polgewebes mit groben Kettpolfaden | [1999/22] | English: | Method for manufacturing a pile fabric with coarse pile warp threads | [1999/22] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un tissu à poil avec des fils de poil de chaîne grossière | [1999/22] | Examination procedure | 04.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/29] | 23.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2253262 (WIRKMASCHINENBAU KARL MARX VEB) [X] 1,2,5 * figure 3; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0628649 (WIELE MICHEL VAN DE NV [BE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0805226 (WIELE MICHEL VAN DE NV [BE]) [A] 1 * abstract * |