EP0935224 - System for performing financial transactions using a smart card [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Citicorp Development Center, Inc. 12731 W. Jefferson Boulevard Los Angeles, California 90066 / US | [1999/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawan Joseph C. 2034 Paramount Drive Hollywood, California 90068 / US | [2004/50] |
Former [1999/32] | 01 /
Kawan Joseph C. 2034 Paramount Drive Holliwood, California 90068 / US | Representative(s) | Johansson, Lars-Erik, et al Hynell Intellectual Property AB Hammarbybacken 27 120 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Johansson, Lars-Erik, et al Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls väg 2 683 40 Hagfors / Uddeholm / SE | ||
Former [2002/51] | Johansson, Lars E., et al Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls Väg 2 683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE | ||
Former [1999/32] | Hynell, Magnus Hynell Patenttjänst AB, Patron Carls väg 2 683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 98204345.7 | 18.12.1998 | [1999/32] | Priority number, date | US19980018791 | 04.02.1998 Original published format: US 18791 | [1999/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0935224 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0935224 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | [2002/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0935224 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10, G07F19/00, G07F7/08 | [2002/20] | CPC: |
G07F7/08 (EP,US);
G06Q20/04 (EP,US);
G06Q20/105 (EP,US);
G06Q20/18 (EP,US);
G06Q20/20 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3572 (EP,US);
G06Q20/363 (EP,US);
G06Q20/4037 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0641 (EP,US);
G07F19/211 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/32] | G07F7/10, G07F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/32] | Extension states | AL | 15.11.2002 | LT | 15.11.2002 | LV | 15.11.2002 | MK | 15.11.2002 | RO | 15.11.2002 | SI | 15.11.2002 | Title | German: | System zum Durchführen von finanziellen Transaktionen mit einer Chipkarte | [1999/32] | English: | System for performing financial transactions using a smart card | [1999/32] | French: | Système pour effectuer des transactions financières avec une carte à puce | [1999/32] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 04.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   18.06.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.12.2004 | BE | 08.12.2004 | CH | 08.12.2004 | CY | 08.12.2004 | FI | 08.12.2004 | FR | 08.12.2004 | IT | 08.12.2004 | LI | 08.12.2004 | NL | 08.12.2004 | SE | 08.12.2004 | IE | 20.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | LU | 08.02.2005 | DK | 08.03.2005 | GR | 08.03.2005 | ES | 19.03.2005 | PT | 08.05.2005 | DE | 01.07.2005 | [2008/12] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
BE | 08.12.2004 | ||
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
CY | 08.12.2004 | ||
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
FR | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
NL | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
IE | 20.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
LU | 08.02.2005 | ||
DK | 08.03.2005 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
ES | 19.03.2005 | ||
DE | 01.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
BE | 08.12.2004 | ||
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
FR | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
NL | 08.12.2004 | ||
IE | 20.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
LU | 08.02.2005 | ||
DK | 08.03.2005 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
ES | 19.03.2005 | ||
DE | 01.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
BE | 08.12.2004 | ||
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
NL | 08.12.2004 | ||
IE | 20.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
LU | 08.02.2005 | ||
DK | 08.03.2005 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
ES | 19.03.2005 | ||
DE | 01.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
BE | 08.12.2004 | ||
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
NL | 08.12.2004 | ||
IE | 20.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 08.03.2005 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
ES | 19.03.2005 | ||
DE | 01.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
BE | 08.12.2004 | ||
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 08.03.2005 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
ES | 19.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
BE | 08.12.2004 | ||
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 08.12.2004 | |
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 08.12.2004 | |
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 08.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0446081 (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0621527 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0717381 (MASTERCARD INTERNATIONAL INC [US]) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9628778 (KNIGHTS TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US5578808 (TAYLOR DOUGLAS C [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US5689668 (BEAUDET PHILLIP [CA], et al) [A] 1-16* the whole document * | by applicant | US4766293 | US4868376 | US4874935 | US5487135 | US5555354 |